Ross et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erika Mercado, C. Louis Bunya, Ryan Zachary Ross and Drew Hunnicutt
Defendant: ROBINHOOD SECURITIES LLC, Trading 212 LTD., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, D1 Capital Partners, L.P., Maplelane Capital, LLC, Barclays Bank P.L.C., E*Trade Securities LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Ally Financial Inc., Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Webull Financial, LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Citadel Securities, LLC, APEX CLEARING CORPORATION, Dough LLC, Point72 Asset Management, L.P., Interactive Brokers, LLC, Melvin Capital Management, LP, E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, Alpaca Securities LLC, TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, TD AMERITRADE INC., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., E*Trade Financial Corporation, Square, LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Free Freetrade, LTD., Etoro USA Securities, LLC, ROBINHOOD MARKETS INC and FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21338
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that Defendant Barclays Bank PLC is dismissed from this action without prejudice re (318 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/27/2021. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21338-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 THIRD ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 24 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00292 with documents 1-21. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21338-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 23 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (pes)
April 7, 2021 Filing 22 Case transferred in from Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00292. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
April 2, 2021 Filing 21 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Southern District of Florida to be included in MDL Docket No. 2989. (lgouadi, 4)
April 2, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
March 24, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, filed.(Volker, Odean)
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Square, LLC, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel)
March 23, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc., Alpaca Securities, LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, D1 Capital Partners, L.P., Dough, LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers, LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Maplelane Capital LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Point72 Asset Management, L.P., Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Webull Financial LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons)(JacquelineMata, 4)
March 23, 2021 Summons Not Issued as to Square, LLC due to these deficiencies: The defendant's name on the Summons form does not match the name on the docket sheet. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(JacquelineMata, 4)
March 22, 2021 Filing 17 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ally Financial, Inc., Alpaca Securities, LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing, LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, D1 Capital Partners, L.P., Dough, LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities, LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers, LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Maplelane Capital LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney, LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Point72 Asset Management, L.P., Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Square, LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc., TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Webull Financial LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons)(Assaad, Gabriel)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Heather Marie Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Jack Edward Pace, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 MOTION for J. Mark Gidley to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Bryan Daniel Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
March 8, 2021 Filing 12 Rule 7.1 DISCLOSURES Statement by Apex Clearing Corporation, filed.(mmapps, 4)
March 8, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Heather Marie Burke to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apex Clearing Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Bryan Daniel Gant to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apex Clearing Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 8, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for J. Mark Gidley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apex Clearing Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Jack Edward Pace, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Apex Clearing Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/29/2021. (mmapps, 4)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL Granting #6 Notice of Dismissal. All claims again Defendant Etoro only are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Etoro USA Securities, LLC by Drew Hunnicutt, Ryan Zachary Ross, Erika Mercado, C. Louis Bunya, filed. (Assaad, Gabriel)
February 22, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Ryan Zachary Ross, filed.(Assaad, Gabriel)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ryan Zachary Ross.(Assaad, Gabriel)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/16/2021 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Ogden on behalf of C. Louis Bunya, Drew Hunnicutt, Erika Mercado, Ryan Zachary Ross, filed. (Ogden, William)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25885923) filed by Ryan Zachary Ross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Assaad, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD SECURITIES LLC
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D1 Capital Partners, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maplelane Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stash Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fumi Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webull Financial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash App Investing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CLEARING CORPORATION
Represented By: Jack E. Pace, III
Represented By: Bryan Daniel Gant
Represented By: Heather Marie Burke
Represented By: John Mark Gidley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dough LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point72 Asset Management, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Brokers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Capital Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open to the Public Investing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Holding Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpaca Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade Clearing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tastyworks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IG Group Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD AMERITRADE INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 UK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Free Freetrade, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etoro USA Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINHOOD MARKETS INC
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Mercado
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. Louis Bunya
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Zachary Ross
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew Hunnicutt
Represented By: Gabriel Amin Assaad
Represented By: William Rey Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?