Ng et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Ng, Chetan Patel, Anuj Kapur, Summit Thakral and Jayesh Shah
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC, Does 1-50, Robinhood Markets, Inc and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21350
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FOURTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 15 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of Texas. Case Number 4:21-cv-00311 with documents 1-12. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21350-CMA on 4/8/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 13 Case transferred in from Texas Southern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00311. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 JPML TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to Southern District of Florida to be included in MDL Docket No. 2989. (lgouadi, 4)
April 2, 2021 Interdistrict transfer to Southern District of Florida. Case transferred electronically. (lgouadi, 4)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of a Motion to Transfer Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 Agreed MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of a Motion to Transfer Before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/31/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Volker, Odean)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, filed.(Volker, Odean)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Anuj Kapur, Brian Ng, Chetan Patel, Jayesh Shah, Summit Thakral, filed.(Patel, Shreedhar)
February 4, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robinhood Securities, LLC served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Patel, Shreedhar)
February 4, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robinhood Markets, Inc. served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Patel, Shreedhar)
February 4, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robinhood Financial, LLC served on 2/2/2021, answer due 4/5/2021, filed.(Patel, Shreedhar)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Patel, Shreedhar)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
January 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-25891864) filed by Anuj Kapur, Chetan Patel, Brian Ng, Jayesh Shah, Summit Thakral. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patel, Shreedhar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ng et al v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Odean L. Volker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Ng
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chetan Patel
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anuj Kapur
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Thakral
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayesh Shah
Represented By: Shreedhar R. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?