Gonzalez v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. doing business as Home Depot USA 277
Case Number: 1:2021cv21407
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jesus Gonzalez (Cunningham, Juan)
May 6, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Bellido, Nelson)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. Calendar Call set for 4/7/2022 at 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 2/10/2022. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 First AMENDED COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., filed by Jesus Gonzalez.(Cunningham, Juan)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Bellido, Nelson)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Attorney Nelson Camilo Bellido added to party Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.(pty:dft). (Bellido, Nelson)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jesus Gonzalez. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Cunningham, Juan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jesus Gonzalez (Cunningham, Juan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Jesus Gonzalez (Cunningham, Juan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (mee)
April 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
April 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14599614, filed by Jesus Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. doing business as Home Depot USA 277
Represented By: Nelson Camilo Bellido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?