Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv21555
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 32 Plaintiff's MOTION to Stay by Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. Responses due by 7/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Petition)(Payton, Harry)
June 15, 2021 Filing 31 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC (Payton, Harry)
May 20, 2021 Filing 30 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Blynn, Aaron)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney James M. Mulcahy, Esq. ; granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Filemon Carrillo, Esq. ; granting #28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Joseph J. Gigliotti, Esq. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
May 19, 2021 Filing 28 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joseph J. Gigliotti. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14699272 by Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. Responses due by 6/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Mr. Gigliotti, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mohorcic, Susan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 27 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Filemon Carrillo. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14699249 by Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. Responses due by 6/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Mr. Carrillo, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mohorcic, Susan)
May 19, 2021 Filing 26 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James M. Mulcahy. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14699204 by Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. Responses due by 6/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification Mr. Mulcahy, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mohorcic, Susan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Marie Mohorcic on behalf of Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. Attorney Susan Marie Mohorcic added to party Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC(pty:pla). (Mohorcic, Susan)
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry A. Payton on behalf of Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. Attorney Harry A. Payton added to party Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC(pty:pla). (Payton, Harry)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File until May 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 5/7/2021. (mws)
May 6, 2021 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blynn, Aaron)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Allard C Chu, Joseph J Gigliotti, James M. Mulcahy, Filemon Carrillo, Gregg D Zucker, mailing date 04/22/2021, (cco)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 Case transferred in from California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-02050. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) GRANTING MOTION TO TRANSFER #8 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #8 MOTION to Transfer Case. Case transferred to the Southern District of Florida. For the reasons explained above, Plaintiff has not met its heavy burden to "point to a statute or judicial decision that clearly states... a strong public policy" barring enforcement of the Development Agreement's forum-selection clause. Sun, 901 F.3d at 1090. Accordingly, the motion to transfer is GRANTED. (See document for details). Case transferred electronically on 4/22/2021. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (mrgo)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING NOTICE-IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc #8 - The motion is submitted. Order to issue. The hearing scheduled for 04/12/2021 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
March 29, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida #8 filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Zucker, Gregg)
March 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC, (Carrillo, Filemon)
March 22, 2021 Filing 14 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida #8 filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Imran Damani, #2 Exhibit A-E to Imran Declaration, #3 Affidavit of Joseph Gigliotti, #4 Exhibit A to Gigliotti Declaration)(Carrillo, Filemon)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Seth Blynn APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC., designating Gregg D. Zucker as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #10 Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Joblove APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC., designating Gregg D. Zucker as local counsel. (mrgo)
March 17, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aaron Seth Blynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30933803) filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zucker, Gregg)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael D. Joblove to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30933679) filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zucker, Gregg)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of Florida filed by Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 4/12/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Bryan Saul, #3 Proposed Order) (Zucker, Gregg)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE for 5/3/2021 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
March 8, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh)
March 5, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS Executed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC, upon Defendant Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. served on 2/5/2021, answer due 2/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez, Intake Specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/10/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 5, 2021 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. a Minnesota Corporation, identifying Pinnacle Foods, Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc., Restaurant Brands International Inc., Michael D. Joblove, Aaron Blynn, Gregg Zucker, Genovese Joblove & Batista, Imran Damani, James Mulcahy, Mulcahy LLP, Joseph Gigliotti, Gigliotti & Gigliotti, Allard Chu, Filemon Carrillo. (Zucker, Gregg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. a Minnesota Corporation. (Zucker, Gregg)
March 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV49914 Receipt No: ACACDC-30867174 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. a Minnesota Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit POS, #4 Exhibit ADR Notice, #5 Exhibit CMC Notice, #6 Exhibit OSC, #7 Exhibit Amended Order, #8 Exhibit Notice & Acknowledgment, #9 Exhibit Case Assignment, #10 Exhibit Notice of Filing Removal) (Attorney Gregg D Zucker added to party POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC. a Minnesota Corporation(pty:dft))(Zucker, Gregg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Represented By: Gregg D. Zucker
Represented By: Aaron Seth Blynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinnacle Foods of California, LLC
Represented By: Filemon Carrillo
Represented By: Joseph J. Gigliotti
Represented By: Allard C. Chu
Represented By: James M. Mulcahy
Represented By: Harry A. Payton
Represented By: Susan Marie Mohorcic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?