Malek et al v. Miami Air International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mehrnoush Mahamoudi and Alisina Malek
Defendant: Miami Air International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv21560
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 14 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
May 14, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT REGARDING Removal Status Report by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
May 14, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Levenson, Joshua)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Miami Air International, Inc. Notice of Filing State Court Documents (Levenson, Joshua)
May 3, 2021 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: Miami Air International, Inc. response due 5/14/2021. ( Removal Status Report due by 5/14/2021.) (lk)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint and Removal Status Report. Defendant may file a response to the complaint and the Removal Status Report by no later than May 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
April 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Ian Katzman on behalf of Mehrnoush Mahamoudi, Alisina Malek (Katzman, David)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint and Deadline to File Removal Status Report re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, #5 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings. Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. AND Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Amended Complaint by Miami Air International, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Consolidation Orders, #2 Exhibit B - Order Lifting Stay, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Docket, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenson, Joshua) Modified Relief on 4/30/2021 (ls). Added MOTION for Extension of Time/Deadline to File Removal Status Report on 4/30/2021 (ls).
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Limited Purposes by Miami Air International, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Consolidation Orders, #2 Exhibit B - Order Lifting Stay)(Levenson, Joshua)
April 26, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE #5 : Removal Status Report due by 5/10/2021. (lk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint and Demand for Trial By Jury) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14629910, filed by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Montreal Convention Signatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Filings, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levenson, Joshua)(No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 4/23/2021 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malek et al v. Miami Air International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Air International, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Royas Levenson
Represented By: Lee Philip Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehrnoush Mahamoudi
Represented By: David Ian Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisina Malek
Represented By: David Ian Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?