Narine et al v. Miami Air International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lorna Narine and Gunness Narine
Defendant: Miami Air International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv21563
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Ian Katzman on behalf of Gunness Narine, Lorna Narine (Katzman, David)
April 30, 2021 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, Amended Complaint by Miami Air International, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Consolidation Orders, #2 Exhibit B - Order Lifting Stay, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levenson, Joshua) Modified Relief on 4/30/2021 (ls).
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Limited Purposes by Miami Air International, Inc.. Responses due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Consolidation Orders, #2 Exhibit B - Order Lifting Stay)(Levenson, Joshua)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Miami Air International, Inc. (Levenson, Joshua)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - First Amended Complaint and Demand for Trial By Jury) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14630186, filed by Miami Air International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Montreal Convention Signatories, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Court Filings, #5 Exhibit 5 - State Court Docket, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Levenson, Joshua) No answer/motion to dismiss. Modified text on 4/23/2021 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Narine et al v. Miami Air International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Air International, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Royas Levenson
Represented By: Lee Philip Teichner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorna Narine
Represented By: David Ian Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gunness Narine
Represented By: David Ian Katzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?