FloSports, Inc. v. Loud and Live Fitness, LLC
Plaintiff: FloSports, Inc.
Defendant: Loud and Live Fitness, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21740
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 6/20/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 6/17/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2021., Discovery due by 2/21/2022., Expert Discovery due by 2/21/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2021., Mediation Deadline 3/7/2022., In Limine Motions due by 3/11/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2022., Motions due by 3/11/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/7/2022.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. Modified text on 6/29/2021 (jbs).
June 29, 2021 Set Deadlines per DE #12 . Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2022. (jbs)
June 28, 2021 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by FloSports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Sammataro, James)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Loud and Live Fitness, LLC, filed by FloSports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Sammataro, James)
June 18, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint,, PURSUANT TO RULE 12(F), Fed.R.Civ.P. by Loud and Live Fitness, LLC. Responses due by 7/2/2021 (Quintero, Frank)
June 8, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint,, PURSUANT TO RULE 12(B), Fed.R.Civ.P. by Loud and Live Fitness, LLC. Responses due by 6/22/2021 (Quintero, Frank)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
June 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Frank Quintero, Jr on behalf of Loud and Live Fitness, LLC. Attorney Frank Quintero, Jr added to party Loud and Live Fitness, LLC(pty:dft). (Quintero, Frank)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by FloSports, Inc.. Loud and Live Fitness, LLC served on 5/18/2021, answer due 6/8/2021. (Sammataro, James)
May 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Loud and Live Fitness, LLC. (jbs)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/10/2021. (jhy)
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
May 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14668410, filed by FloSports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) as to Loud and Live Fitness, LLC, #3 Exhibit 1-Media Rights Agreement, #4 Exhibit 2-Amendment No. 1, #5 Exhibit 3-Maltiskys May 21, 2020 email, #6 Exhibit 4-October 15, 2020 correspondence, #7 Exhibit 5-FloSports notice of rejection, #8 Exhibit 6-January 6, 2021 letter from Holland & Knight, #9 Exhibit 7-FloSports March 24, 2021 letter to Loud & Live)(Sammataro, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FloSports, Inc. v. Loud and Live Fitness, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loud and Live Fitness, LLC
Represented By: Frank Quintero, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FloSports, Inc.
Represented By: James George Sammataro
Represented By: Brendan Stuart Everman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?