Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C. v. SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C.
Petitioner: TECNICAS REUNIDAS DE TALARA S.A.C.
Respondent: SSK INGENIERIA Y CONSTRUCCION S.A.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv22206
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0010
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, filed by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C.. Replies due by 8/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 -- Supplemental Declaration of Leandro Meneses in Support of TRTs Petition to Vacate Arbitral Award, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 -- Declaration of Alma Gomez in Support of TRTs Petition To Vacate Arbitral Award)(Stack, Brian)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time. Responses to Motion to Dismiss Petitioner's Petition to Vacate Final Arbitral Award and Motion for Sanctions due by 8/12/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 27, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to file response in opposition to Respondents Motion to Dismiss Petitioners Petition to Vacate Final Arbitral Award and Motion for Sanctions re #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C.. Responses due by 8/10/2021 (Stack, Brian)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #17 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C.; Petitioner must respond to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions [ECF No. #15 ], filed on July 19, 2021 by August 2, 2021. Upon service of the response, Respondent will have 7 days to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 22, 2021 Filing 17 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C. (Stack, Brian)
July 22, 2021 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. identifying Corporate Parent Inversiones Internacionales Ingenieria y Construccion Sigdo Koppers Spa, Corporate Parent Ingenieria y Construccion Sigdo Koppers Group S.A., Corporate Parent Sigdo Koppers S.A. for SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. (Gonzalez, Daniel)
July 19, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, by SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C.. Responses due by 8/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Timeline of Relevant Dates, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of C. Conejero)(Gonzalez, Daniel)
July 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C. re #10 Summons Returned Executed,,, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Compliance) (Epelbaum, Sammy)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - Granting #12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, filed by SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. Response now due by 7/19/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, by SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C.. Attorney Daniel Eduardo Gonzalez added to party SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C.(pty:res). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Daniel)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 7/22/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C.. SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clerk of Court FedEx, DHL, and UPS Deliveries to SSK Corporate Headquarters, #2 Exhibit Email Transmissions to Cuatrecasas Law Firm, #3 Exhibit Email Transmission to SSK Corporate Representative, #4 Exhibit Personal Delivery on Cuatrecasas Law Firm, #5 Exhibit Personal Delivery on SSK and SSK Corporate Representative, #6 Exhibit FedEx and DHL Deliveries to Cuatrecasas Law Firm, #7 Exhibit FedEx and DHL Deliveries to SSK Corporate Headquarters, #8 Exhibit FedEx and DHL Deliveries to SSK Corporate Representative, #9 Exhibit Florida Secretary of State Substitute Service Documents)(Epelbaum, Sammy)
June 21, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C. (Stack, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of International Services as to SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. Article #10 5145 4821 (ls)
June 16, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of International Services as to SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. Article #1Z 2T9 R9C D4 2000 0418 (ls)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of International Services as to SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C. Article #7740 1793 5820 (ls)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Expedited Ex-Parte Motion for Court-Directed Alternate Service of Process. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION For Order Authorizing Alternate Means of Service Under Rule 4 re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award, by TECNICAS REUNIDAS DE TALARA S.A.C.. (Stack, Brian)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SSK INGENIERIA Y CONSTRUCCION S.A.C., Secretary of State of the State of Florida. (jao)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate Arbitration Award. Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14771898, filed by TECNICAS REUNIDAS DE TALARA S.A.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A Declaration of Leandro Meneses, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B Declaration of Raimundo Gutierrez Acuna, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) Summons to Respondent, #5 Summon(s) Summons to Secretary of State)(Stack, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tecnicas Reunidas De Talara S.A.C. v. SSK Ingenieria Y Construccion S.A.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TECNICAS REUNIDAS DE TALARA S.A.C.
Represented By: Sean R. Santini
Represented By: Robert Harris
Represented By: Brian Joseph Stack
Represented By: Denise Brody Crockett
Represented By: Sammy Epelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SSK INGENIERIA Y CONSTRUCCION S.A.C.
Represented By: Daniel Eduardo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?