Nightkiss Marine Ltd. v. World Fuel Services Canada, ULC
Plaintiff: Nightkiss Marine Ltd.
Defendant: World Fuel Services Canada, ULC
Case Number: 1:2021cv22244
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to World Fuel Services Canada, ULC. (jao)
August 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Nightkiss Marine Ltd. re #4 Order (Boeringer, William)
August 3, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by World Fuel Services Canada, ULC. World Fuel Services Canada, ULC waiver sent on 7/15/2021, answer due 9/13/2021. (Gambach, David)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint filed by Nightkiss Marine Ltd. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (jao)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against World Fuel Services Canada, ULC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14779297, filed by Nightkiss Marine Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Boeringer, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nightkiss Marine Ltd. v. World Fuel Services Canada, ULC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nightkiss Marine Ltd.
Represented By: William R. Boeringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Fuel Services Canada, ULC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?