Diaz-Lopez v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: Annarys Diaz-Lopez
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv22315
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Movant, Annarys Diaz-Lopez's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Reply. Movant has until September 10, 2021 to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Answer to Complaint by Annarys Diaz-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petruzzi, Paul)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer for failure to supply a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Answer to Complaint by Annarys Diaz-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petruzzi, Paul)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America. Attorney Allyson Fritz added to party United States of America(pty:dft). (Fritz, Allyson)
July 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Annarys Diaz-Lopez re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1) (Petruzzi, Paul)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Annarys Diaz-Lopez. Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Annarys Diaz-Lopez re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255), (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Form 2255) (Petruzzi, Paul)
June 23, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (drz)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION (Complaint) to Vacate Sentence (2255) . NOTE: All further docketing is to be done in the civil case. (Criminal Case # 19-CR-20705), filed by Annarys Diaz-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Petruzzi, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz-Lopez v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS OFFICE FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Noticing 2255 US Attorney
Represented By: Allyson Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annarys Diaz-Lopez
Represented By: Paul Domenic Petruzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?