Trump et al v. Facebook, Inc et al
Plaintiff: DONALD J TRUMP, Elizabeth Albert, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Jennifer Horton, Donald J. Trump, Andres Cabos, Magalys Rios and Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda
Defendant: Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg
Case Number: 1:2021cv22440
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA for lack of jurisdiction. All pending motions are DENIED as moot re #97 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Andrew Christenson, #96 Notice of Appeal, filed by David Andrew Christenson. USCA #21-14038-E. (apz)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte. Given that this case has been transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, see Case No. 3:21-cv-09044, this case is now closed in the Southern District of Florida. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #113 the letter received from David Andrew Christenson is STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/29/2021. (sgm)
November 24, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of filing letter by David Andrew Christenson (jbs)
November 23, 2021 Filing 112 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-09044, filed 11/22/2021. (bb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 111 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #96 Notice of Appeal filed by David Andrew Christenson. Date received by USCA: 11/17/2021. USCA Case Number: 21-14038-D. (apz)
November 22, 2021 Filing 110 Clerks Notice to Filer re #109 Motion to Set Deadline for United States' Memorandum. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Motion; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. A motion event must always be selected when filing a motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
November 22, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:21-cv-22440 electronically transferred out to California Northern. (jas)
November 21, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of Intervention, and Motion to Set Deadline for United States' Memorandum in Defense of 47 U.S.C. 230(C) by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kolsky, Joshua) Modified to add Motion Relief on 11/22/2021 (jas).
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING #75 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER THIS CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to take all actions necessary to TRANSFER this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (sgm)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court sua sponte. In accordance with #106 the Court's November 19, 2021 Order Denying David Andrew Christenson's Motions, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #89 #90 #91 #92 #93 #94 #95 #98 #100 #101 #102 #103 #104 #105 David Andrew Christenson's submissions in this case are STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/19/2021. (sgm)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER DENYING #89 #90 #91 #92 #94 #95 #98 #100 #101 #102 #103 #104 #105 DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON'S MOTIONS IN THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE. Given his repeated violations of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED not to docket any further submissions by Mr. Christenson in this case, without prior approval. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (sgm)
November 19, 2021 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to File - 3rd Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to File - 4th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 103 MOTION for Leave to File - 2nd Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 102 MOTION for Leave to File - Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 101 MOTION for Leave to File - 12th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 100 MOTION to Reopen the Settlement and to increase the Settlement to 20 Trillion Dollars, Motion to create a 20 Trillion Dollar Medical Settlement, Motion for Punitive (Treble) Damages (120 Trillion Dollars), Motion to add the United States of America and the United Kingdom (Britain) as Defendants by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to File - Motion to Consolidate and Motion to Intervene and Join by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to File - 11th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 17, 2021 Transmission of Notices of Appeals, Orders under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #97 Notice of Appeal, #96 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
November 16, 2021 Filing 95 MOTION for Leave to File - 10th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 16, 2021 Filing 94 MOTION for Leave to File - 9th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (jbs)
November 15, 2021 Filing 93 Letters from David Andrew Christenson. (apz)
November 15, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for Leave to File - 8th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (ls)
November 15, 2021 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to File Counter Claims against President Donald J. Trump, Citizen Donald J. Trump, and Presidential Candidate Donald J. Trump (2016) by David Andrew Christenson. (ls)
November 15, 2021 Filing 90 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Counter Claims against President Donald J. Trump, Citizen Donald J. Trump, and Presidential Candidate Donald J. Trump (2016) by David Andrew Christenson. (ls)
November 15, 2021 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File - 5th Memorandum by David Andrew Christenson. (ls)
October 27, 2021 Filing 88 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Beguiristain, Maria)
October 20, 2021 Filing 87 NOTICE by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump re #78 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Filing Exhibits Declarations in Support of Plaintiff Donald J. Trump's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [DE-78] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Alan Dershowitz, #2 Exhibit B. Declaration of Samantha Ferrara, #3 Exhibit C. Declaration of Corey R. Lewandowski, #4 Exhibit D. Declaration of Christl Pitre Mahfouz) (Baldwin, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 Motion to Change Venue Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Change Venue filed by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. (Baldwin, Matthew)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on #83 Defendants' Unopposed Motion, which seeks an extension of time to respond to #14 Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and #78 Plaintiff Donald J. Trump's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, as well as permission to exceed the page limit in responding to the #78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.Upon review of the Motion and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #83 Defendants' Unopposed Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Should the Court deny #75 Defendants' Motion to Transfer, then Defendants shall respond to both the #16 Amended Complaint and #78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before 30 days after the Court's ruling. Further, Defendants may each file a response to the #78 Motion for Preliminary Injunction that does not exceed 30 pages in length.Should the Court grant #75 Defendants' Motion to Transfer, and this case is transferred, the same scheduling changes and page limit extension shall apply unless the Northern District of California decides otherwise. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/19/2021. (sgm)
October 13, 2021 Filing 84 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel - Pro Se by Kevin W. Cassaday (jbs)
October 12, 2021 Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #78 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal , Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beguiristain, Maria)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on #81 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to #75 Defendants' Motion to Transfer. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #81 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs shall file the Sur-Reply on or before October 19, 2021. With the exception of only the signature block, the Sur-Reply must total no more than seven (7) pages. The Sur-Reply shall respond to arguments made in #79 Defendants' Reply in Support of #75 the Motion to Transfer, regarding Judge K. Michael Moore's Order on Motion to Transfer in Trump v. YouTube, LLC, No. 21-CIV-22445. The Sur-Reply may not respond to any other arguments made in #79 Defendants' Reply. The Court will strike any argument in the Sur-Reply that fails to comply with this Order. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/12/2021. (sgm)
October 12, 2021 Filing 81 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. (Baldwin, Matthew)
October 12, 2021 Filing 80 NOTICE by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump re #77 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Filing Exhibits in Support of Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Facebook, Inc., and Mark Zuckerberg's Motion to Transfer [DE-77] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Baldwin, Matthew)
October 8, 2021 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 Motion to Change Venue filed by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order in Case No. 21-cv-22445)(Beguiristain, Maria)
October 7, 2021 Filing 78 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A(i), #2 Exhibit A(ii), #3 Exhibit AA(i), #4 Exhibit AA(ii), #5 Exhibit AA(iii), #6 Exhibit AAA(i), #7 Exhibit AAA(ii), #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit BB, #10 Exhibit BBB(i), #11 Exhibit BBB(ii), #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit CC(i), #14 Exhibit CC(ii), #15 Exhibit CC(iii), #16 Exhibit CCC(i), #17 Exhibit CCC(ii), #18 Exhibit CCC(iii), #19 Exhibit D, #20 Exhibit DD, #21 Exhibit DDD(i), #22 Exhibit DDD(ii), #23 Exhibit DDD(iii), #24 Exhibit E, #25 Exhibit EE(i), #26 Exhibit EE(ii), #27 Exhibit EEE(i), #28 Exhibit EEE(ii), #29 Exhibit EEE(iii), #30 Exhibit F, #31 Exhibit FF, #32 Exhibit FF(i), #33 Exhibit FFF(ii), #34 Exhibit FFF(iii), #35 Exhibit G(i), #36 Exhibit G(ii), #37 Exhibit GG, #38 Exhibit GGG(i), #39 Exhibit GGG(ii), #40 Exhibit GGG(iii), #41 Exhibit H, #42 Exhibit HH(i), #43 Exhibit HH(ii), #44 Exhibit HH(iii), #45 Exhibit HHH(i), #46 Exhibit HHH(ii), #47 Exhibit HHH(iii), #48 Exhibit I(i), #49 Exhibit I(ii), #50 Exhibit I(iii), #51 Exhibit II(i), #52 Exhibit II(ii), #53 Exhibit III(i), #54 Exhibit III(ii), #55 Exhibit III(iii), #56 Exhibit J(i), #57 Exhibit J(ii), #58 Exhibit J(iii), #59 Exhibit JJ, #60 Exhibit JJJ(i), #61 Exhibit JJJ(ii), #62 Exhibit JJJ(iii), #63 Exhibit K(i), #64 Exhibit K(ii), #65 Exhibit K(iii), #66 Exhibit KK, #67 Exhibit KKK(i), #68 Exhibit KKK(ii), #69 Exhibit KKK(iii), #70 Exhibit L(i), #71 Exhibit L(ii), #72 Exhibit L(iii), #73 Exhibit LL, #74 Exhibit LLL(i), #75 Exhibit LLL(ii), #76 Exhibit LLL(iii), #77 Exhibit M(i), #78 Exhibit M(ii), #79 Exhibit MM, #80 Exhibit MMM(i), #81 Exhibit MMM(iI), #82 Exhibit MMM(iii), #83 Exhibit N, #84 Exhibit NN(i), #85 Exhibit NN(ii), #86 Exhibit NN(iii), #87 Exhibit NNN(i), #88 Exhibit NNN(ii), #89 Exhibit NNN(iii), #90 Exhibit NNN(iv), #91 Exhibit NNN(v), #92 Exhibit NNN(vi), #93 Exhibit NNN(vii), #94 Exhibit NNN(vii), #95 Exhibit NNN(ix), #96 Exhibit NNN(x), #97 Exhibit O, #98 Exhibit OO(i), #99 Exhibit OO(ii), #100 Exhibit OOO(i), #101 Exhibit OOO(ii), #102 Exhibit OOO(iii), #103 Exhibit OOO(iv), #104 Exhibit OOO(v), #105 Exhibit OOO(vi), #106 Exhibit OOO(vii), #107 Exhibit OOO(viii), #108 Exhibit OOO(ix), #109 Exhibit OOO(x), #110 Exhibit OOO(xi), #111 Exhibit OOO(xii), #112 Exhibit OOO(xiii), #113 Exhibit OOO(xiv), #114 Exhibit OOO(xv), #115 Exhibit P(i), #116 Exhibit P(ii), #117 Exhibit P(iii), #118 Exhibit P(iv), #119 Exhibit P(v), #120 Exhibit P(vi), #121 Exhibit P(vii), #122 Exhibit PP, #123 Exhibit PPP(i), #124 Exhibit PPP(ii), #125 Exhibit PPP(iii), #126 Exhibit PPP(iv), #127 Exhibit PPP(v), #128 Exhibit Q, #129 Exhibit QQ(i), #130 Exhibit QQ(ii), #131 Exhibit QQQ(i), #132 Exhibit QQQ(ii), #133 Exhibit QQQ(iii), #134 Exhibit QQQ(iv), #135 Exhibit QQQ(v), #136 Exhibit R, #137 Exhibit RR(i), #138 Exhibit RR(ii), #139 Exhibit RRR(i), #140 Exhibit RRR(ii), #141 Exhibit S(i), #142 Exhibit S(ii), #143 Exhibit SS(i), #144 Exhibit SS(ii), #145 Exhibit SSS, #146 Exhibit T(i), #147 Exhibit T(ii), #148 Exhibit TT, #149 Exhibit TTT, #150 Exhibit U(i), #151 Exhibit U(ii), #152 Exhibit UU, #153 Exhibit UUU, #154 Exhibit V(i), #155 Exhibit V(ii), #156 Exhibit VV, #157 Exhibit VVV, #158 Exhibit W(i), #159 Exhibit W(ii), #160 Exhibit WW(i), #161 Exhibit WW(ii), #162 Exhibit WWW, #163 Exhibit X(i), #164 Exhibit X(ii), #165 Exhibit XX(i), #166 Exhibit XX(ii), #167 Exhibit Y(i), #168 Exhibit Y(ii), #169 Exhibit Y(iii), #170 Exhibit YY(i), #171 Exhibit YY(ii), #172 Exhibit Z(i), #173 Exhibit Z(ii), #174 Exhibit ZZ(i), #175 Exhibit ZZ(ii))(Baldwin, Matthew)
October 1, 2021 Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #75 Motion to Change Venue filed by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 10/8/2021. (Baldwin, Matthew)
September 20, 2021 Filing 76 Clerks Notice to Filer re #75 MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (jbs)
September 17, 2021 Filing 75 MOTION to Transfer to the Northern District of California and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Beguiristain, Maria) Modified relief on 9/20/2021 (jbs).
September 10, 2021 Filing 74 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kiyan Michael, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Elizabeth Albert, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump, Magalys Rios, Bobby Michael. Mark Zuckerberg waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Baldwin, Matthew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 73 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kiyan Michael, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Elizabeth Albert, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump, Magalys Rios, Bobby Michael. Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 9/7/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Baldwin, Matthew)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #71 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Craig S. Primis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
September 9, 2021 Attorney Craig Primis representing Facebook, Inc. (Defendant) and Zuckerberg, Mark (Defendant) Activated. (pt)
September 8, 2021 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig S. Primis. Second Renewed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kenneth Winn Allen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
September 8, 2021 Attorney Kenneth Winn Allen representing Facebook, Inc. (Defendant) and Zuckerberg, Mark (Defendant) Activated. (pt)
September 7, 2021 Filing 69 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kenneth Winn Allen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ronald K. Anguas, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
September 7, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney James Xi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
September 7, 2021 Filing 65 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James Xi. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14988152 by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Katherine Epstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
September 3, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Katherine Epstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Kate Epstein. Kate Epstein is not listed as a member of the bar of a court listed in the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/3/2021. (rr00)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #56 Renewed Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Craig Primis. Local counsel did not consent to filing and serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/3/2021. (rr00)
September 3, 2021 Filing 60 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (Beguiristain, Maria)
September 3, 2021 Filing 59 NOTICE of Striking #49 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Facebook, Inc. by Facebook, Inc. (Beguiristain, Maria)
September 3, 2021 Filing 58 Clerks Notice to Filer re #49 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (jbs)
September 3, 2021 Attorney Craig Primis representing Facebook, Inc. (Defendant) and Zuckerberg, Mark (Defendant) Activated. (cw)
September 2, 2021 Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kate Epstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14982591 by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 2, 2021 Filing 56 Renewed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig Primis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ronald Anguas. Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Local counsel may find a sample motion on the Court's website and refile the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/2/2021. (rr00)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney K. Winn Allen. Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Local counsel may find a sample motion on the Court's website and refile the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/2/2021. (rr00)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Craig Primis. Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Local counsel may find a sample motion on the Court's website and refile the motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/2/2021. (rr00)
September 2, 2021 Filing 52 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ronald Anguas. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14982215 by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 2, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for K. Winn Allen. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14982179 by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 2, 2021 Filing 50 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Beguiristain, Maria)
September 2, 2021 Filing 49 STRICKEN per DE #59 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (Fay, William) Modified text on 9/3/2021 (jbs).
September 2, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig Primis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14981610 by Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Responses due by 9/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit)(Beguiristain, Maria)
September 2, 2021 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Josefa Beguiristain on behalf of Facebook, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. Attorney Maria Josefa Beguiristain added to party Facebook, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Maria Josefa Beguiristain added to party Mark Zuckerberg(pty:dft). (Beguiristain, Maria)
August 31, 2021 Filing 46 Summons Issued as to Mark Zuckerberg (jbs)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on #40 the United States Government's Unopposed Motion to Stay the Intervention Deadline. Upon review of the Motion and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #40 the Government's Unopposed Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The deadline for the Government to intervene in the above-captioned case will not be stayed, but additional time to consider the Government's response is granted. Consequently, on or before November 22, 2021, the Government shall decide whether it intends to intervene in this case and file the appropriate notice. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/23/2021. (sgm)
August 23, 2021 Filing 44 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #43 Letter. Document Restricted Due to Filing Error. The filing (letter) violates DE 38 ORDER. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED not to docket any materials submitted to the Court by Cris Ericson in the above-captioned case that fail to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, without prior approval from the Court. DE #43 Letter has been returned to the filer. All future filings that violates this Court's Order will also be returned (ail)
August 23, 2021 Filing 43 **RESTRICTED** Letter to Your Honor from Cris Ericson (ls) Text Modified & Entry Restricted on 8/23/2021 (ail).
August 20, 2021 Filing 42 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. (jbs)
August 20, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump re #16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal filed by Kiyan Michael, Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Donald J. Trump (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Baldwin, Matthew)
August 19, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Stay Intervention Deadline, and Acknowledgement of Notice of Constitutional Challenge by United States of America. Responses due by 9/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua)
August 19, 2021 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Kolsky on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Joshua Kolsky added to party United States of America(pty:ip). (Kolsky, Joshua)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on #36 Cris Ericson's Notice of Filing. On August 18, 2021, the Court entered an #35 Order Denying Cris Ericson's Motion to Join as Plaintiff. For the same reasons discussed in #35 the Order, #36 the Notice of Filing is not properly before the Court. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #36 Cris Ericson's Notice of Filing is STRICKEN. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED not to docket any materials submitted to the Court by Cris Ericson in the above-captioned case that fail to comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, without prior approval from the Court. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/19/2021. (sgm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance/Mailing re #35 Order on Motion to Adopt/Join (pes)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING #29 MOTION TO JOIN AS PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (sgm)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING #27 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMICUS BRIEF. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (sgm)
August 18, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. Replies due by 8/25/2021. (Baldwin, Matthew)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on #31 Plaintiff Donald J. Trump's Amended Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that #31 Plaintiff's Amended Motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is permitted to file a motion for preliminary injunction and supporting memorandum of up to 30 pages total. In light of the foregoing, #30 Plaintiff Donald J. Trump's Motion for Leave to File Excess Page is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/17/2021. (sgm)
August 16, 2021 Filing 31 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. (Baldwin, Matthew)
August 13, 2021 Filing 30 Plaintiff's MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Donald J. Trump. (Baldwin, Matthew)
August 5, 2021 Filing 29 MOTION to Join as Plaintiff re #1 Complaint by Cris Ericson. (jbs)
August 5, 2021 Filing 28 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Greg Degeyter, mailing date August 5, 2021. (cw)
August 4, 2021 Filing 27 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE BY CHRIS SEVIER OF DE FACTO ATTORNEYS GENERAL, JOHN GUNTER JR OF SPECIAL FORCES OF LIBERTY, AND PASTOR RICH PENKOSKI OF WARRIORS OF CHRIST ON THE ISSUE OF STANDING IN PARTIAL SUPPORT AND IN PARTIAL OPPOSITION OF THE PLAINTIFFS by John Gunter Jr., Rich Penkoski, Christopher Sevier. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit)(jbs)
August 2, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Richard Polk Lawson (Lawson, Richard)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Roland A. Paul. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
August 2, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Polk Lawson on behalf of Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Elizabeth Albert(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Andres Cabos(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Jennifer Horton(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Bobby Michael(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Kiyan Michael(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Magalys Rios(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda(pty:pla), Attorney Richard Polk Lawson added to party Donald J. Trump(pty:pla). (Lawson, Richard)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Ryan S. Tougias. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael J. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
July 30, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Roland A. Paul. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14889698 by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 8/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Roland A. Paul, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan S. Tougias. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14889673 by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. Responses due by 8/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Ryan S. Tougias, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael J. Jones. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14889623 by Elizabeth Albert, Andres Cabos, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, Magalys Rios, Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda, Donald J. Trump. Attorney Matthew Lee Baldwin added to party Andres Cabos(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Lee Baldwin added to party Magalys Rios(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Lee Baldwin added to party Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda(pty:pla). Responses due by 8/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Michael J. Jones, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 30, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 17 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): res Cabos, Magalys Rios and Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda. (Baldwin, Matthew)
July 28, 2021 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (jbs)
July 27, 2021 Filing 16 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kiyan Michael, Donald J. Trump, Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael.(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 22, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Compliance re #14 Order. Certified mailing receipt attached. (ail)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER CERTIFYING CONSTITUTIONAL QUESTION. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (sgm)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER. John Q. Kelly, Esq. filed a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (ECF No. 12). In his Motion, Mr. Kelly corrected the bar of the Court where he is a member in good standing. When Mr. Kelly filed his initial Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (ECF No. 8), the Court conducted its own research and confirmed that Mr. Kelly is a barred attorney and that he is eligible to practice in this District. The Court, therefore, granted his initial Motion. (ECF No. 11). Thus, the Court DENIES AS MOOT Mr. Kelly's Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (ECF No. 12). Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/13/2021. (rr00)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 Corrected MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Q. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, DONALD J TRUMP. Responses due by 7/26/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification - John Q. Kelly, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John Q. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney John P. Coale. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
July 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John Q. Kelly. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14832280 by Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, DONALD J TRUMP. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of John Q. Kelly, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for John P. Coale. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14832238 by Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, DONALD J TRUMP. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of John P. Coale, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14832157 by Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, DONALD J TRUMP. Responses due by 7/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr., #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Matthew)
July 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE by Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael, Kiyan Michael, DONALD J TRUMP of Constitutional Question (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint) (Baldwin, Matthew)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for all discovery disputes and non-dispositive pretrial motions. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 7/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
July 7, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg (jbs)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14825052, filed by Kiyan Michael, DONALD J TRUMP, Elizabeth Albert, Jennifer Horton, Bobby Michael. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons (Facebook), #3 Summon(s) Summons (Zuckerberg))(Baldwin, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trump et al v. Facebook, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD J TRUMP
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Albert
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Coale
Represented By: John Q. Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Michael
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Coale
Represented By: John Q. Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiyan Michael
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Coale
Represented By: John Q. Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Horton
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Coale
Represented By: John Q. Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Frank C. Dudenhefer, Jr.
Represented By: John P. Coale
Represented By: John Q. Kelly
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andres Cabos
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magalys Rios
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rodriguez-Fresneda
Represented By: Matthew Lee Baldwin
Represented By: Michael J. Jones
Represented By: Richard Polk Lawson
Represented By: Roland A. Paul
Represented By: Ryan Tougias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Primis
Represented By: K. Winn Allen
Represented By: Maria Josefa Beguiristain
Represented By: William Dylan Fay
Represented By: Ronald Anguas
Represented By: Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.
Represented By: James Xi
Represented By: Katherine Epstein
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Zuckerberg
Represented By: Craig Primis
Represented By: K. Winn Allen
Represented By: Maria Josefa Beguiristain
Represented By: Ronald Anguas
Represented By: Ronald K. Anguas, Jr.
Represented By: James Xi
Represented By: Katherine Epstein
Represented By: Kenneth Winn Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?