Brown v. Crawford
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Brown
Defendant: J. Crawford
Case Number: 1:2021cv22715
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Raag Singhal
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Officer J. Crawford. (daa)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO U.S. MARSHAL RE SERVICE OF PROCESS REQUIRING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON AN INDIVIDUAL: Officer J. Crawford. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (daa)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re #8 Order. Additional Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) sent to Joseph Michael Brown (ls)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Excessive Force Claim shall proceed against Defendant J. Crawford, in his individual capacity. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (ls)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee but Establishing Debt to Clerk of $ 350.00. USM Service NOT Ordered. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Referral to Volunteer Attorney Program by Joseph Michael Brown. (daa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joseph Michael Brown. (daa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. (daa)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against J. Crawford. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Joseph Michael Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?