Saunders v. Calder Casino et al
Plaintiff: Darren Andre Saunders
Defendant: Calder Casino/Churchhill Downs (INC.), William C. Carstanjen, Paulina Lopez and Richard Shuku
Case Number: 1:2021cv22860
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 9/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw)
September 14, 2021 Filing 9 OBJECTIONS TO THE DENIAL OF IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ECF NO. { #3 } re #6 Report and Recommendation by Darren Andre Saunders. (jbs)
September 14, 2021 Filing 8 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Darren Andre Saunders to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: daspromark@yahoo.com (jbs)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Darren Andre Saunders. Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jbs)
August 30, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION on Plaintiff Darren Andre Saunders' Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. ECF No. #3 . Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (hgz)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra per DE #4 . Motions referred to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. (vjk)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Darren Andre Saunders. Motions referred to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 8/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw)
August 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darren Andre Saunders. (cds)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Calder Casino/Churchill Downs (INC.), William C. Carstanjen, , Paulina Lopez, Richard Shuku. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Darren Andre Saunders. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(cds) Modified Text on 8/5/2021 (cds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saunders v. Calder Casino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Andre Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calder Casino/Churchhill Downs (INC.)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William C. Carstanjen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paulina Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Shuku
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?