World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd v. Alcyone International Marine, Inc.
Plaintiff: World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd d/b/a World Fuel Services and World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd doing business as World Fuel Services
Defendant: Alcyone International Marine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv23051
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order of Dismissal. The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. All pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 16, 2021 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated per DE #11 Order. (amb)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 Amended STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd (Gambach, David) Text Modified on 9/16/2021 (amb).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring amended stipulation of dismissal indicating whether the parties agree that this case should be dismissed with or without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal by World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd (Gambach, David)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Requiring Amended Complaint - (Amended Complaint due by 9/15/2021.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
August 24, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alcyone International Marine, Inc. (pes)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against Alcyone International Marine, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14951559, filed by World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd d/b/a World Fuel Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gambach, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd v. Alcyone International Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd d/b/a World Fuel Services
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Fuel Service (Singapore) Pte Ltd doing business as World Fuel Services
Represented By: David Neal Gambach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcyone International Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?