Holler v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Julie A. Holler
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2021cv23101
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Attorney Lee Warren Marcus added to party Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft). (Marcus, Lee)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Julie A. Holler. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 9/28/2021, answer due 10/19/2021. (Palamara, Alexander)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Julie A. Holler Of Filing Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Palamara, Alexander)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (pes)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14963433, filed by Julie A. Holler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A)(Palamara, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holler v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie A. Holler
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Palamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Lee Warren Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?