Adkins v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Nicole Adkins
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2021cv23137
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America (Mederos, Stefanie)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by November 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/20/2021. (mpt)
October 20, 2021 Reset Deadlines Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 11/3/2021. Per DE#7. (cqs)
October 18, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Stefanie M. Mederos added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mederos, Stefanie)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nicole Adkins. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/29/2021, answer due 10/20/2021. (Palamara, Alexander)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/28/2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
August 31, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (mee)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14970595, filed by Nicole Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit LTD Policy)(Palamara, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Adkins
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Palamara
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Stefanie M. Mederos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?