Prince v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Nicole Prince
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2021cv23151
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 6/29/2022., Motions due by 7/5/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/26/2022., Calendar Call set for 11/3/2022 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2022 11:45 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 11/7/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (jw)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Insurance Company of North America identifying Corporate Parent New York Life Insurance Company for Life Insurance Company of North America (Gerson, Shari)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America. Attorney Shari Lyn Gerson added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft). (Gerson, Shari)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nicole Prince. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/29/2021, response/answer due 10/20/2021. (Jessup, Stephen)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. (bb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14974250, filed by Nicole Prince. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Jessup, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Prince
Represented By: Stephen Francis Jessup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Shari Lyn Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?