Del medico v. Wells Fargo Bank N. A.
Plaintiff: Ranieri Ricardo Ambrosi Del medico
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N. A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv23278
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Referring Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Filing 19 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Ronald M. Friedman as Mediator. (Patino, Ralph)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a sua sponte examination of the record. On October 15, 2021, the Court referred this matter to mediation. 13 . The Court's Paperless Order of Referral to Mediation requires the parties to "agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order." Id. Thus, the Parties' Notice of Mediator Selection was due on or before November 1, 2021. The Court warned that "[i]f mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed." 13 . To date, the Parties have not filed a Notice of Mediator Selection. Accordingly, the Parties are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before November 15, 2021, as to why a Notice of Mediator Selection has not been filed on the docket. Alternatively, on or before November 15, 2021, the Parties may file a Notice of Mediator Selection Mediation on the docket. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/8/2021. (elm)
October 27, 2021 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Wells Fargo Bank N. A.. (Diaz Cofino, Michelle)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Therein, Defendant requests that the Court extend the October 20, 2021 deadline to reply to Plaintiff's response in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by seven (7) days, to October 27, 2021, due to "other pressing professional commitments and pretrial deadlines unrelated to this matter." Id. at 1. Defendant informs the Court that Plaintiff does not oppose the instant Motion. Id. at 12. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion #14 , the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #14 is GRANTED. Defendant shall reply to Plaintiffs response in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss on or before October 27, 2021. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/20/2021. (elm)
October 20, 2021 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time Proposed Order re #10 Response/Reply (Other),. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
October 19, 2021 Filing 14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 Motion to Dismiss #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), for Failure to State a Claim by Wells Fargo Bank N. A.. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Diaz Cofino, Michelle) Modified Relief and Document Link on 10/20/2021 (ls).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Trial having been set in this matter for the two week trial period beginning August 29 2022, at 9:00 a.m. pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedure and Rule 16.2 of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. All parties are required to participate in mediation. The mediation shall be completed no later than eighty (80) days before the scheduled trial date. 2. Plaintiff's counsel, or another attorney agreed upon by all counsel of record and any unrepresented parties, shall be responsible for scheduling the mediation conference. The parties are encouraged to avail themselves of the services of any mediator on the List of Certified Mediators, maintained in the office of the Clerk of this Court, but may select any other mediator. The parties shall agree upon a mediator and file a Notice of Mediator Selection within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order. If there is no agreement, lead counsel shall file a request for the Clerk of Court to appoint a mediator in writing within fifteen (15) days from the date of this Order, and the Clerk shall designate a mediator from the List of Certified Mediators. Designation shall be made on a blind rotation basis. 3. The parties shall agree upon a place, date, and time for mediation convenient to the mediator, counsel of record, and unrepresented parties and file a Notice of Scheduling Mediation no later than one hundred and ten (110) days prior to the scheduled trial date. If the parties cannot agree to a place, date, and time for the mediation, they may motion the Court for an order dictating the place, date, and time. 4. The physical presence of counsel and each party or representatives of each party with full authority to enter in a full and complete compromise and settlement is mandatory. If insurance is involved, an adjuster with authority up to the policy limits or the most recent demand, whichever is lower, shall attend. 5. All discussions, representations and statements made at the mediation conference shall be confidential and privileged. 6. At least ten (10) days prior to the mediation date, all parties shall present to the mediator a brief written summary of the case identifying issues to be resolved. Copies of those summaries shall be served on all other parties. 7. The Court may impose sanctions against parties and/or counsel who do not comply with the attendance or settlement authority requirements herein, or who otherwise violate the terms of this Order. The mediator shall report non-attendance and may recommend imposition of sanctions by the Court for non-attendance. 8. The mediator shall be compensated in accordance with the standing order of the Court entered pursuant to Rule 16.2.B.6, or on such basis as may be agreed to in writing by the parties and the mediator selected by the parties. The cost of mediation shall be shared equally by the parties unless otherwise ordered by the Court. All payments shall be remitted to the mediator within 30 days of the date of the bill. Notice to the mediator of cancellation or settlement prior to the scheduled mediation conference must be given at least two (2) full business days in advance. Failure to do so will result in imposition of a fee for one hour. 9. If a full or partial settlement is reached in this case, counsel shall promptly notify the Court of the settlement in accordance with Local Rule 16.2.F, by filing a notice of settlement signed by the counsel of record within ten (10) days of the mediation conference. Thereafter, the parties shall forthwith submit an appropriate pleading concluding the case. 10. Within five (5) days following the mediation conference, the mediator shall file a Mediation Report indicating whether all required parties were present. The report shall also indicate whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. 11. If mediation is not conducted, the case may be stricken from the trial calendar, and other sanctions may be imposed. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/15/2021. (elm)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL IN MIAMI. This case is now set for trial commencing the two week trial period of August 29, 2022, at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 13-1, (thirteenth floor) United States Courthouse, 400 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida. All parties are directed to report to the calendar call on August 25, 2022, at 2 p.m., at which time all matters relating to the scheduled trial date may be brought to the attention of the Court. A final pretrial conference as provided for by Rule 16, Fed. R. Civ. P., and Rule 16.1(C), S.D. Fla. L.R., is scheduled for August 16, 2022, at 11 a.m. A bilateral pretrial stipulation and all other pretrial preparations shall be completed NO LATER THAN FIVE DAYS PRIOR TO THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. All motions to amend the pleadings or to join additional parties must be filed by the later of forty-five (45) days after the date of entry of this Order, or forty-five (45) days after the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant. Any and all pretrial motions, including motions for summary judgment, Daubert motions, and motions in limine must be filed no later than eighty (80) days prior to the trial date. Responses to summary judgment motions must be filed no later than fourteen (14) days after service of the motion, and replies in support of the motion must be filed no later than seven (7) days after service of the response, with both deadlines computed as specified in Rule 6, Fed. R. Civ. P. Each party is limited to one Daubert motion. If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Each party is also limited to one motion in limine (other than Daubert motions). If all evidentiary issues cannot be addressed in a 20-page memorandum, the parties must file for leave to exceed the page limit. Rule 26(a)(2) expert disclosures shall be completed one hundred thirty (130) days prior to the date of trial. All discovery, including expert discovery, shall be completed one hundred (100) days prior to the date of trial. The failure to engage in discovery pending settlement negotiations shall not be grounds for continuance of the trial date. All exhibits must be pre-marked, and a typewritten exhibit list setting forth the number and description of each exhibit must be submitted at the time of trial. Plaintiff's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "P" as a prefix. Defendant's exhibits shall be marked numerically with the letter "D" as a prefix. For a jury trial, counsel shall prepare and submit proposed jury instructions to the Court. The Parties shall submit their proposed jury instructions and verdict form jointly, although they do not need to agree on each proposed instruction. Where the parties do not agree on a proposed instruction, that instruction shall be set forth in bold type. Instructions proposed only by a plaintiff should be underlined. Instructions proposed only by a defendant should be italicized. Every instruction must be supported by citation to authority. The parties should use the Eleventh Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions for Civil Cases as a guide, including the directions to counsel contained therein. The parties shall jointly file their proposed jury instructions via CM/ECF, and shall also submit their proposed jury instructions to the Court via e-mail at moore@flsd.uscourts.gov in WordPerfect or Word format. For a non-jury trial, the parties shall prepare and submit to the Court proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law fully supported by the evidence, which counsel expects the trial to develop, and fully supported by citations to law. The proposed jury instructions or the proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law shall be submitted to the Court no later than five (5) business days prior to the scheduled trial date. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. THE FILING BY COUNSEL OF A "NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY" BY MOTION OR OTHERWISE IS NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE LOCAL RULES AND SHALL NOT BE PRESUMED TO ALTER OR MODIFY THE COURT'S SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/15/2021. (elm)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Wells Fargo Bank N. A. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Diaz Cofino, Michelle)
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Ranieri Ricardo Ambrosi Del medico. (Patino, Ralph)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff Ranieri Ricardo Ambrosio Del Medico's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. #8 . Therein, Plaintiff requests that the Court extend the October 8, 2021 deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to October 12, 2021, due to a "family emergency." Id. at 1. Plaintiff informs the Court that Defendant does not oppose Plaintiff's Motion. Id. at 2. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #8 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #5 on or before October 13, 2021. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/12/2021. (elm)
October 8, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ranieri Ricardo Ambrosi Del medico. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Patino, Ralph)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. #6 . Defendant filed its Motion to Dismiss on September 17, 2021. #5 . Thus, Plaintiff's response is due on or before October 1, 2021. #6 at 1. Now, Plaintiff requests that the Court extend the deadline for him to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss to October 8, 2021. Id. Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #6 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the Motion to Dismiss on or before October 8, 2021. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 10/1/2021. (tgr)
September 29, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ranieri Ricardo Ambrosi Del medico. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Patino, Ralph)
September 17, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank N. A.. Responses due by 10/1/2021 (Diaz Cofino, Michelle)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LAUREN F. LOUIS. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Louis's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/13/2021. (hwr)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. THIS ORDER has been entered upon the filing of a Notice of Removal. Counsel for the removing party is hereby ORDERED to forward a copy of this Order to all other parties. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference within twenty (20) days of the date of this Order. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a Joint Scheduling Report. The report shall indicate the proposed month and year for the trial and the estimated number of days required for trial. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer, or may offer, if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (A) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (B) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address, and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibility of a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report may result in remand or dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The filing of a motion to dismiss, or other motion, does not toll the time for filing a joint scheduling report. Counsel for the non-removing party must file a motion to remand the case on the basis of any defect other than lack of subject matter jurisdiction within thirty (30) days after the filing of the Notice of Removal. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one-inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 9/13/2021. (hwr)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Plaintiff's Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15000107, filed by Wells Fargo Bank N. A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Summary, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons and Return of Service, #4 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Diaz Cofino, Michelle) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 9/10/2021 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del medico v. Wells Fargo Bank N. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranieri Ricardo Ambrosi Del medico
Represented By: Alison E Patino
Represented By: Ralph George Patino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N. A.
Represented By: Reginald John Clyne
Represented By: Michelle Diaz Cofino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?