Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Plaintiff: Laura Veira, Dan Blonsky, Ruben Dapena, Kevin Karpel, Nancy Mansour, William Mansour, Neville Marques, Isidro Calderon, Michael Goldenberg, Michelle Goldenberg, Julio Martinez, Mercedes Gaspard, Nicole Gaspard, Levi Taylor, M. Elena Kendall, A&B Real Estate Holdings LLC, Carlos Salabarria, Steve Binns, Michael Zelenenki, Karina Martinez, Amrita Roopchand, Rennie Roopchand, Dolores Jarvis, SANTIAGO GUZMAN, Jackelyn Aguirre-Matat, Bruno Eseban Ullauri Paredes, Karina Jannine Svoboda Straka, Elvis Ferrera, Baco Annetta LLC, Shona Blonsky, Marfelia Calderon, Martin Kuntz, M and M Closers LLC, Aliesky Santiago and Karma Zelenenki
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG, Knauf International GmbH, Knauf Insulation GMBH, Knauf UK GMBH, Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG, Knauf DO Brasil LTD, PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia, Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD, Knauf Plasterboard (Wuhu) Co LTD and Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Case Number: 1:2021cv23542
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Directing Clerk to Take Action. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (pc)
November 19, 2021 Filing 47 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Status Conference held on 11/19/2021 via Zoom Meeting. Plaintiff has 35 days to file individual claims. Parties will have 65 days to meet and confer and submit proposed scheduling order. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): James Victor Doyle, Jr, James Victor Doyle, Sr, Daniel John Dysart, and Timothy Andrew Kolaya. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #42 #43 #44 and #45 motions to appear pro consent to designation, and request to electronically receive notices. Attorneys Michael R. Dodson, Daniel John Dysart, Kerry James Miller, and Rebekka C. Veith are given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of Defendants Knauf Gips KG and Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. The Clerk of the Court is directed to provide these attorneys with notification of all electronic filings via the email addresses set forth in the motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (agn)
November 17, 2021 Filing 45 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael R. Dodson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #40 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 44 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rebekka C. Veith. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 43 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel J. Dysart. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #38 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 17, 2021 Filing 42 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kerry J. Miller. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 12/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 17, 2021 Attorney Michael R. Dodson representing Knauf Gips KG (Defendant) and Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD (Defendant); Attorney Daniel John Dysart representing Knauf Gips KG (Defendant) and Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD (Defendant); ; Attorney Kerry James Miller representing Knauf Gips KG (Defendant) and Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD (Defendant); ; Attorney Rebekka C. Veith representing Knauf Gips KG (Defendant) and Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD (Defendant); Activated. (pt)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies without prejudice #37 #38 #39 and #40 motions to appear pro hac vice. The motions fail to certify that the pro hac vice attorneys have not filed three or more motions for pro hac vice admission in this District within the last 365 days are required by L.R. 4(b) of the Rules Governing the Admission, Practice, Peer Review, and Discipline of Attorney. Sample motions can be found on the Courts website. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
November 4, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael R. Dodson. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15150836 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rebekka C. Veith. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15150835 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 38 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Daniel J. Dysart. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15150832 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
November 4, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Kerry J. Miller. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-15150827 by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolaya, Timothy)
October 27, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy Andrew Kolaya on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD. Attorney Timothy Andrew Kolaya added to party Knauf Gips KG(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Andrew Kolaya added to party Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD(pty:dft). (Kolaya, Timothy)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER re Zoom Status Conference on November 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m., in the Miami Division, before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Appearances may be made via Zoom. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1612638675?pwd=SzAya0pxSlJ0K1BkaDJVcndTd3VDQT09 Meeting ID: 161 263 8675 Passcode: 054634 Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 A video status conference is set on November 19, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. in the Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Zoom instructions to follow by separate order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
October 19, 2021 Filing 33 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Status Conference re Schedule/Procedures held on 10/19/2021 via Zoom meeting. Second status conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:30 AM via Zoom meeting. Counsel of record will receive a Meeting ID number and Passcode via CM/ECF. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): James Victor Doyle, Jr, James Victor Doyle, Sr, Daniel John Dysart, Michael R. Dodson, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
October 15, 2021 Filing 32 PAPERLESS NOTICE re status conference presently set for 10/19/2021 at 11:00 AM. At the time of the status conference, the parties shall appear via teleconference. Join ZoomGov Meeting:https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1607533698?pwd=cFZ2SGI4K3R0cmRVNUFkbk9CWnAyZz09 Meeting ID: 160 753 3698 Passcode: 921399 Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #30 the Plaintiffs' unopposed motion to suspend the deadline for filing the severed individual civil actions. After remand of a putative class action to the Northern District of Alabama, the parties agreed to sever the individual Plaintiffs' claims related to real property outside of Alabama. Accordingly, the Northern District of Alabama transferred the above-captioned case to the Southern District of Florida and ordered the Plaintiffs to file the individual actions in this District by October 14, 2021. The Plaintiffs seek a suspension or stay of that deadline. Because the motion is unopposed and the Court recognizes the complexities of the claims, the motion is granted and the deadline to file the individual actions is temporarily stayed. Notwithstanding, the Court finds it necessary to set a status conference to discuss the new deadline to file and the logistics of the forthcoming individual actions. A video status conference is set on October 19, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. in the Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Zoom instructions to follow by separate order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
October 13, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to file severed individual civil actions by A&B Real Estate Holdings LLC, Jackelyn Aguirre-Matat, Baco Annetta LLC, Steve Binns, Dan Blonsky, Shona Blonsky, Isidro Calderon, Marfelia Calderon, Ruben Dapena, Elvis Ferrera, SANTIAGO GUZMAN, Mercedes Gaspard, Nicole Gaspard, Michael Goldenberg, Michelle Goldenberg, Dolores Jarvis, Kevin Karpel, M. Elena Kendall, Martin Kuntz, M and M Closers LLC, Nancy Mansour, William Mansour, Neville Marques, Julio Martinez, Karina Martinez, Bruno Eseban Ullauri Paredes, Amrita Roopchand, Rennie Roopchand, Carlos Salabarria, Aliesky Santiago, Karina Jannine Svoboda Straka, Levi Taylor, Laura Veira, Karma Zelenenki, Michael Zelenenki. Attorney James V. Doyle added to party A&B Real Estate Holdings LLC(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Jackelyn Aguirre-Matat(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Baco Annetta LLC(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Steve Binns(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Dan Blonsky(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Shona Blonsky(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Isidro Calderon(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Marfelia Calderon(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Ruben Dapena(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Elvis Ferrera(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party SANTIAGO GUZMAN(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Mercedes Gaspard(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Nicole Gaspard(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Michael Goldenberg(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Michelle Goldenberg(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Dolores Jarvis(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Kevin Karpel(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party M. Elena Kendall(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Martin Kuntz(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party M and M Closers LLC(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Nancy Mansour(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party William Mansour(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Neville Marques(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Julio Martinez(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Karina Martinez (pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Bruno Eseban Ullauri Paredes(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Amrita Roopchand(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Rennie Roopchand(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Carlos Salabarria(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Aliesky Santiago(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Karina Jannine Svoboda Straka(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Levi Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Laura Veira(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Karma Zelenenki(pty:pla), Attorney James V. Doyle added to party Michael Zelenenki(pty:pla). Responses due by 10/27/2021 (Doyle, James)
October 7, 2021 Filing 29 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney James V. Doyle, Jr., James Victor Doyle, Sr., Michael R Dodson, Daniel John Dysart, Kerry James Miller, mailing date October 7, 2021, (pt)
October 7, 2021 Filing 28 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
October 7, 2021 Filing 27 Case transferred in from Alabama Northern; Case Number 5:14-cv-02204. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The Court severs and transfers certain plaintiffs, as listed in the order, to the FLSD, ALSD, FLMD, MSSD, and TXSD, DISMISSES plaintiffs, A. DSouza, B. Desjardins, N. Khan, A. Kjos, and R. Swanson, and orders plaintiffs counsel to file a fifth amended complaint within 21 days from the entry date of this order, as more fully set in order; original electronic record will be uploaded to the Clerks of Court where the parties are being transferred to within 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/22/2021. (AHI)
September 21, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to re #23 Order filed by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - Due to damage caused by Hurricane Ida, the Court extends the deadline for the parties to submit the proposed order referenced in the 30 Order issued on 8/30/2021 from 9/7/2021 until 9/21/2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/1/2021. (AHI)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The parties are to submit an updated proposed order by 9/7/2021 which clearly and explicitly states which plaintiffs' cases are to be severed, which court those plaintiffs' cases are to be transferred to and which plaintiffs' cases are to be retained, as more fully set out in order. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 8/30/2021. (AHI)
June 4, 2021 Filing 22 Amended MOTION Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Motion for Entry of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael)
May 5, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION For Entry of Proposed Order by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Dodson, Michael)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/26/2021. (KBW)
April 21, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 4/21/2021; James Doyle present for plaintiffs; Michael Dodson and Kerry Miller present for defendants; Parties discussed current posture of the case. Parties to submit a proposed order for severance and transfer not later than May 5, 2021. (SPT )
April 21, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kerry James Miller by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael)
April 21, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel John Dysart by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dodson, Michael)
April 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3823378 (B4601112799). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI).
April 21, 2021 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-382336 (B460112798). (Dodson, Michael) Modified on 4/22/2021 (AHI).
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for Wednesday, 4/21/2021, at 2:30 p.m. CST; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/19/21. (SPT )
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT Report of Mediator - Mediation was Unsuccessful by Brad Wash. filed by Brad Wash (Wash, R) Modified on 4/15/2021 (AHI).
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to conduct mediation is hereby extended to April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/15/2021. (KBW)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd. (Dodson, Michael)
February 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Dodson on behalf of Knauf Gips KG, Knauf Plasterboard Tianjin Co Ltd (Dodson, Michael)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Victor Doyle, Sr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Doyle, James)
February 4, 2021 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Liles C Burke: Telephone Conference held on 2/4/2021; James Doyle, Jr. present for plaintiff; The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ordered to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ordered to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. (Court Reporter Lindy Fuller.) (SPT )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court conducted a telephone conference in this matter on February 4, 2021. As discussed during the conference, the parties hereby ORDERED to mediate this case within 45 days. The parties are further ORDERED to file a joint status report on or before March 22, 2021, regarding the results of the mediation. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/4/21. (BJL)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER that a Telephone Conference is set for 2/4/2021 at 10:45 a.m.; dial in information will be emailed to counsel. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/01/21. (SPT )
January 6, 2021 Filing 8 DOCKET SHEET for Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK)
January 6, 2021 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER from Eastern District of Louisiana (2:14-cv-02722-EEF-MBN). (KEK) (KEK, ).
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 Case reassigned to Judge Liles C Burke. Judge Inge P Johnson no longer assigned to the case. (KEK)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-30) of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Eastern District of Louisiana for inclusion in MDL 2047 In re: Chinese-Manufactured Drywall Products Liability Litigation; certified copy of docket entries and documents electronically sent to transferee clerk in Eastern District of Louisiana. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eldon E. Fallon. (CTS, )12/8/14.
November 17, 2014 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Knauf Insulation GmbH. Delivered via certified mail. (PSM)
November 14, 2014 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Luciana Bado, Elizabeth Bennett, Jennifer Brady, CDO Investments LLC, Mary Sue Caranna, Damian Cason, Mardechria Charles, Bonnie Cordier, Ajesh D'Souza, Bill Desjardins, George Ferry, Stephanie Fussell, Michael Ginart, Jack Green, Tim Hoffman, Ike Ijemere, Jeremy Jordan, Noor Khan, Ashley Kjos, Paul J Kleinmann, MCF Enterprises Inc, Toni Macksey, Karen McCann, Mindy Milam, Ronald Pendelton, Peter Robinson, Jason Scott, Rusty Swanson, Laura Veira, Jinxi Zhu. (Doyle, James)
November 14, 2014 Filing 2 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT (PSM)
November 14, 2014 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2286113 (NDAL Receipt No. B460105755). related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PSM). (Doyle, James) Modified on 11/14/2014 (PSM).
November 13, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Elizabeth Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft KG et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Veira
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Blonsky
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruben Dapena
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Karpel
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mansour
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Mansour
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neville Marques
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isidro Calderon
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Goldenberg
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Goldenberg
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Martinez
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercedes Gaspard
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Gaspard
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Taylor
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Elena Kendall
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&B Real Estate Holdings LLC
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Salabarria
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Binns
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zelenenki
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Martinez
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amrita Roopchand
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rennie Roopchand
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Jarvis
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANTIAGO GUZMAN
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackelyn Aguirre-Matat
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruno Eseban Ullauri Paredes
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Jannine Svoboda Straka
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvis Ferrera
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baco Annetta LLC
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shona Blonsky
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marfelia Calderon
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Kuntz
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M and M Closers LLC
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aliesky Santiago
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karma Zelenenki
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf International GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Insulation GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf UK GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf AMF GmbH & Co KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf DO Brasil LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PT Knauf Gypsum Indonesia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Gips KG
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael R. Dodson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard (Tianjin) Co LTD
Represented By: Daniel John Dysart
Represented By: Kerry James Miller
Represented By: Michael R. Dodson
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knauf Plasterboard (Wuhu) Co LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guangdong Knauf New Building Material Products Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?