Bay Village Condos, LLC v. WHG Hotel Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: Bay Village Condos, LLC
Defendant: WHG Hotel Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv23552
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 Defendant's REPLY to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion, DEFENDANT, WHG HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC.S REPLY TO RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF, BAY VILLAGE CONDOS, LLCS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by WHG Hotel Management, Inc.. (Smith, Mary)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline WHG HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC.S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF, BAY VILLAGE CONDOS, LLCS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL filed by Bay Village Condos, LLC. Replies due by 11/22/2021. (Waldman, Glen)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Plaintiff Bay Village Condos, LLC's Motion to Remand and Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery within seven (7) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline WHG HOTEL MANAGEMENT, INC.S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF, BAY VILLAGE CONDOS, LLCS MOTION TO REMAND AND MOTION FOR JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY by WHG Hotel Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Organizational Chart, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Mary)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Hawwi Wondimu Edao representing WHG Hotel Management, Inc. (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR FOLEY & LARDNER LLP by Hawwi W. Edao for / by WHG Hotel Management, Inc.. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Smith, Mary)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand by Bay Village Condos, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Waldman, Glen)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by WHG Hotel Management, Inc.. (Smith, Mary)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15077128, filed by WHG Hotel Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Village Condos, LLC v. WHG Hotel Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Village Condos, LLC
Represented By: Glen H. Waldman
Represented By: Michael Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHG Hotel Management, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Leslie Smith
Represented By: Hawwi Wondimu Edao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?