Luis v. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Landy Luis
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou, SECRETARY Alejandro MAYORKAS, Linda Swacina, Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Secretary, U.S. Department Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv23683
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Landy Luis (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of service)(Soto, Eduardo)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Of Referral And Notice Of Court Practice And Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 28, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, U.S. Department Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Landy Luis (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Attorney General Summons, #2 Summon(s) Dept of Homeland Security Summons, #3 Summon(s) Miami USCIS Summons, #4 Summon(s) U.S. State Attorney Summons) (Soto, Eduardo)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (kpe)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15105040, filed by Landy Luis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit LPR Card, #4 Exhibit N-400 Receipt Notice, #5 Exhibit N-400 Biometrics Appointment, #6 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Update, #7 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #8 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #9 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #10 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #11 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #12 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #13 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry, #14 Exhibit USCIS Case Status Inquiry)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Soto, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luis v. Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landy Luis
Represented By: Eduardo Rigoberto Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY Alejandro MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Swacina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?