Hiles v. Odenstein et al
3Rd Party Plaintiff: MARCUS HILES
3Rd Party Defendant: Holger Odenstein, Fernan Hernandez and BARBARA PUCHE
Case Number: 1:2021cv23729
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #13 Transmittal Letter Sent, #12 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion to Withdraw, Order on Motion to Remand to State Court (cds)
November 30, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (mmd)
November 22, 2021 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: 11th Judicial Circuit. State Court Case Number: 21-019852 (cqs)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REMANDING CASE. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by MARCUS HILES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Farber, David)
November 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw Document #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Fernan Hernandez, Holger Odenstein, BARBARA PUCHE. Responses due by 12/3/2021 (Mahajan, Megha)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Fernan Hernandez, Holger Odenstein, BARBARA PUCHE (Mahajan, Megha)
November 9, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal with Prejudice #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Responses due by 11/23/2021) by Fernan Hernandez, Holger Odenstein. (Mahajan, Megha)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 Third Party Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by BARBARA PUCHE. (Mahajan, Megha)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Fernan Hernandez, Holger Odenstein, BARBARA PUCHE (Mahajan, Megha)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 10/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert Chaiken, mailing date October 22, 2021, (pt)
October 22, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15113517, filed by BARBARA PUCHE, Fernan Hernandez, Holger Odenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Mahajan, Megha) Modified Text on 10/22/2021 (cds). No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hiles v. Odenstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MARCUS HILES
Represented By: David Scott Farber
Represented By: Robert L. Chaiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Holger Odenstein
Represented By: Megha M Mahajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Fernan Hernandez
Represented By: Megha M Mahajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: BARBARA PUCHE
Represented By: Megha M Mahajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?