Symons v. INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenneth Symons
Defendant: INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv24087
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING ARBITRATION, granting #11 Motion to Stay. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 22, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and, Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint Proceedings Pending Arbitration by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Reed, Aaron)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file their responsive pleading by December 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/15/2021. (cpo)
December 15, 2021 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. Attorney Aaron Jarett Reed added to party INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reed, Aaron)
December 15, 2021 Reset Deadlines Per DE#10. Responses due by 12/22/2021 (cqs)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kenneth Symons. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Return of Service)(Cummings, Toussaint)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC. (mee)
November 22, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Kenneth Symons re 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Cummings, Toussaint)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (mee)
November 19, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15188597, filed by Kenneth Symons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC)(Cummings, Toussaint)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symons v. INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Symons
Represented By: Brian Howard Pollock
Represented By: Toussaint Marcus Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERSTATE MANAGEMENT COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Jarett Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?