Contreras Munoz et al v. Secretary, U.S. Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Soraya De La Consolaci Contreras Munoz, Eduardo Soto P.A. and Soraya De La Consolacion Contreras Munoz
Defendant: Secretary Antony J. Blinken, Assistant Secretary Renata Bitter, SECRETARY Alejandro MAYORKAS, Secretary, U.S. Department of State, Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State and Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv24088
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE by Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State, Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security, Secretary, U.S. Department of State re #9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Regarding Cancellation of Beneficiary (Weinkle, James)
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State, Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security, Secretary, U.S. Department of State. Responses due by 1/20/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Interview Notice Scheduling 1/21/2022 Interview)(Weinkle, James)
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Alan Weinkle on behalf of Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State, Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security, Secretary, U.S. Department of State. Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney James Alan Weinkle added to party Secretary, U.S. Department of State(pty:dft). (Weinkle, James)
November 30, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Service by Soraya De La Consolacion Contreras Munoz, Eduardo Soto P.A. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit affidavit of service)(Soto, Eduardo) Modified text on 11/30/2021 (pcs).
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 23, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (pcs)
November 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Soraya De La Consolacion Contreras Munoz, Eduardo Soto P.A. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Soto, Eduardo)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State, Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security, Secretary, U.S. Department of State (pcs) Modified text on 11/22/2021 (pcs).
November 19, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (pcs)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15188900, filed by Soraya De La Consolaci Contreras Munoz, Eduardo Soto P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Consular Affairs, #3 Summon(s) DHS, #4 Summon(s) DOS, #5 Exhibit approval notice, #6 Exhibit uscis case status, #7 Exhibit nvc welcome letter, #8 Exhibit IV application confirmation, #9 Exhibit nvc inquiry, #10 Exhibit nvc inquiry receipt, #11 Exhibit nvc inquiry, #12 Exhibit nvc inquiry response, #13 Exhibit nvc inquiry receipt, #14 Exhibit nvc confirmation letter, #15 Exhibit nvc inquiry request, #16 Exhibit nvc inquiry receipt, #17 Exhibit nvc confirmation)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Soto, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras Munoz et al v. Secretary, U.S. Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soraya De La Consolaci Contreras Munoz
Represented By: Eduardo Rigoberto Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Soto P.A.
Represented By: Eduardo Rigoberto Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soraya De La Consolacion Contreras Munoz
Represented By: Eduardo Rigoberto Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Antony J. Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Secretary Renata Bitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY Alejandro MAYORKAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Secretary, Bureau of Consular Affairs, Department of State
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, U.S Department Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: James Alan Weinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?