Mansour v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG
Plaintiff: Nancy Mansour
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG
Case Number: 1:2021cv24169
Filed: November 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASE. This Case No. 21-24169 is consolidated with this matter (Case No.21-24171). All future filings in both actions must be filed in Case No. 21-24171. This case is administratively closed. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (ail)
November 30, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (pc)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Take Action, ( Amended Complaint due by 12/24/2021., Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/24/2022) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (pc)
November 29, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
November 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG. Filing fees $ 402.00 due, filed by Nancy Mansour.(pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansour v. Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mansour
Represented By: James V. Doyle
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Jr.
Represented By: James Victor Doyle, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gebrueder Knauf Verwaltungsgesellschaft, KG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?