Hammond v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Darryl Hammond
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv24207
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Melissa Damian
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 5/20/2022. In Limine Motions due by 10/4/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/26/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/23/2022. Status Report due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) 2022-6 to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (yar)
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 Joint Notice and NON-CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge For Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Darryl Hammond (Palamara, Alexander)
January 10, 2022 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Darryl Hammond (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palamara, Alexander)
January 10, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Acree, William)
January 10, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney William Cleveland Acree, II added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Acree, William)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by January 17, 2022. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/23/2021. (cpo)
December 23, 2021 Reset Deadlines The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer due 1/17/2022. Per DE#6. (cqs)
December 22, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time To respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Matthew Adam Jordan added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint)(Jordan, Matthew)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (mee)
November 30, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15208671, filed by Darryl Hammond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit LTD Policy)(Palamara, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammond v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Hammond
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Palamara
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Cleveland Acree, II
Represented By: Matthew Adam Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?