Dunham-Zemberi v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Bryce Dunham-Zemberi
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2021cv24224
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Bryce Dunham-Zemberi (Palamara, Alexander)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule: (Trial set for 8/29/2022 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Calendar Call set for 8/24/2022 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 5, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings per DE #9 Order **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Trial set for 8/29/2022 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. (pes)
January 4, 2022 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation, Corporate Parent Lincoln National Life Insurance Company for Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Marcus, Lee)
January 4, 2022 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston (Marcus, Lee)
January 4, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Attorney Lee Warren Marcus added to party Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft). (Marcus, Lee)
January 3, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bryce Dunham-Zemberi. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 12/14/2021, response/answer due 1/4/2022. (Palamara, Alexander)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Bryce Dunham-Zemberi re #1 Complaint, of re-filing Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Palamara, Alexander)
December 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (jao)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15211559, filed by Bryce Dunham-Zemberi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Palamara, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunham-Zemberi v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryce Dunham-Zemberi
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Palamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Lee Warren Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?