PNC Bank, N.A. v. Colmenares Brothers, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Defendant: Colmenares Brothers, LLC and Jose A Colmenares
Case Number: 1:2021cv24229
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Melissa Damian
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) - 2022-5 to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan no longer assigned to case. (yar)
December 13, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by PNC Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent The PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent PNC Holding LLC for PNC Bank, N.A. (Lilley, Brock)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Breach of Line of Credit Agreement and Breach of Guaranty against Jose A Colmenares, Colmenares Brothers, LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lilley, Brock)
December 10, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Sealing #1 -1 pursuant to #6 Order. (kpe)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal. Exhibit A to the complaint, ECF No. #1 -1, will be SEALED. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Motions referred to Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Exhibit A to Complaint for Breach of Line of Credit Agreement and Breach of Guaranty per Local Rule 5.4 by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Olinto, Jamie)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jose A Colmenares, Colmenares Brothers, LLC. (cds)
December 1, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
December 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Line of Credit Agreement and Breach of Guaranty against PNC Bank, N.A.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15213132, filed by PNC Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s) to Colmenares Brothers, LLC, #6 Summon(s) to Jose A. Colmenares)(Olinto, Jamie) Modified by sealing #1 -1 per DE #6 Order on 12/9/2021. (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, N.A. v. Colmenares Brothers, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jamie Wathen Olinto
Represented By: Brock Robert Lilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colmenares Brothers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A Colmenares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?