Duarte Jaquez v. GARLAND et al
Petitioner: Cesar Horacio Duarte Jaquez
Respondent: Attorney General MERRICK B. GARLAND, Secretary Antony J. Blinken, E K CARLTON and MERRICK B. GARLAND
Case Number: 1:2021cv24318
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2022 Filing 10 REPLY to #7 Response to Habeas Petition Petitioner's Reply Memorandum in Support of Habeas Corpus Petition by Cesar Horacio Duarte Jaquez. (Bell, Henry)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER. Petitioner shall file a reply in support of its #1 Petition for Habeas Corpus no later than February 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 1/28/2022. (cvl)
January 26, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca A. Haciski on behalf of Antony J. Blinken, E K CARLTON, MERRICK B. GARLAND. Attorney Rebecca A. Haciski added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:res), Attorney Rebecca A. Haciski added to party E K CARLTON(pty:res), Attorney Rebecca A. Haciski added to party MERRICK B. GARLAND(pty:res). (Haciski, Rebecca)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Antony J. Blinken, E K CARLTON, MERRICK B. GARLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit U.S. Department of State Declaration and Mexican Diplomatic Note)(Wu, Jason)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: 28 U.S.C. 2241 Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason Wu on behalf of Antony J. Blinken, E K CARLTON, MERRICK B. GARLAND. Attorney Jason Wu added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:res), Attorney Jason Wu added to party E K CARLTON(pty:res), Attorney Jason Wu added to party MERRICK B. GARLAND(pty:res). (Wu, Jason)
December 14, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Cesar Horacio Duarte Jaquez (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bell, Henry)
December 14, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. (pcs)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15242366, filed by Cesar Horacio Duarte Jaquez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Javier Mijangos y Gonzalez)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Bell, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte Jaquez v. GARLAND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cesar Horacio Duarte Jaquez
Represented By: Henry Philip Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General MERRICK B. GARLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary Antony J. Blinken
Represented By: Jason Wu
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Rebecca A. Haciski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: E K CARLTON
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Rebecca A. Haciski
Represented By: Jason Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MERRICK B. GARLAND
Represented By: Jason Wu
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Represented By: Rebecca A. Haciski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?