Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.109.188.88
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.109.188.88
Case Number: 1:2021cv24407
Filed: December 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER Granting #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 27, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION MOTION FOR AN AMENDED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
January 3, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order D)(Walker, Rachel)
December 23, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC. for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Walker, Rachel)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (original mailed to Copyright Office) (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee)
December 20, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
December 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.109.188.88. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15263209, filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.109.188.88
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Represented By: Tyler Adam Mamone
Represented By: Yetian Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 76.109.188.88
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?