Arana v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Estefano Arana
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv20742
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear via Videoconference at Mediation on 08/23/2022 at 10:00 a.m. (EST) by Estefano Arana. Responses due by 5/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward)
May 9, 2022 Filing 14 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Jack L. Townsend, Sr as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 08/23/2022 at 10:00 a.m. (EST). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward)
April 21, 2022 Filing 13 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to Show Cause, by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Suarez, Tanya)
April 21, 2022 Filing 12 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Suarez, Tanya)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that Defendant shall comply with the March 18, 2022 Order #5 by April 21, 2022. Furthermore, in its written submission, Defendant shall explain why it failed to comply with the March 18, 2022 Order, necessitating this second Order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Edwin G. Torres. Bench Trial set for 2/27/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 2/21/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 5/31/2022. Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 10/31/2022. Mediation Deadline 11/7/2022. All pre-trial Motions due by 11/15/2022. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 12/13/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Estefano Arana (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dabdoub, Edward)
April 13, 2022 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Estefano Arana (Dabdoub, Edward)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Attorney Tanya Irene Suarez added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Suarez, Tanya)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 4/18/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 18, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Estefano Arana. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 3/17/2022, response/answer due 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (ebz)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15469417, filed by Estefano Arana. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arana v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estefano Arana
Represented By: Kevin P Schaefer
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Tanya Irene Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?