Cooper v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sabrina Cooper
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv20744
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Furman, Wendy)
April 21, 2022 Filing 11 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Sabrina Cooper (Alters, Rachel)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #9 the Parties' Joint Motion to Conduct Initial Conference by Telephone. The Parties may meet via telephone in satisfaction of this Court's requirement that the Parties meet to prepare the Parties' Joint Conferral Report. All other provisions and deadlines set forth in #8 the Court's Order Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/15/2022. (jea)
April 14, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Conduct Initial Conference by Telephone by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Furman, Wendy)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Civil Trial Date and Pretrial Schedule: ( Trial set for 4/24/2023 at 9:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/20/2023 at 1:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/23/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (pes) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 6, 2022 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Furman, Wendy)
April 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danielle Erica Shure on behalf of United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Attorney Danielle Erica Shure added to party United of Omaha Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Shure, Danielle)
April 6, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Attorney Wendy Lynn Furman added to party United of Omaha Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Furman, Wendy)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sabrina Cooper. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company served on 3/16/2022, response/answer due 4/6/2022. (Alters, Rachel)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (bb)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15469720, filed by SABRINA COOPER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Alters, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Cooper
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Represented By: Rachel Alters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Wendy Lynn Furman
Represented By: Danielle Erica Shure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?