Solowsky v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Michele Solowsky
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2022cv20750
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery. Per DE #11 (pc) Modified text on 4/27/2022 (pc).
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Calendar Call set for 6/14/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles., Status Conference set for 11/23/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Darrin P. Gayles.), ORDER Scheduling Mediation ( Mediation Deadline 11/4/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles. on 4/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 26, 2022 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Michele Solowsky (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Magistrate Election Form)(Dabdoub, Edward)
April 11, 2022 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michele Solowsky (Dabdoub, Edward)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before April 26, 2022, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 4/8/2022. (jsi)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Prudential Financial, Inc. for The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Acree, William)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney William Cleveland Acree, II added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft). (Acree, William)
March 18, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Michele Solowsky. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 3/16/2022, response/answer due 4/6/2022. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Dabdoub, Edward)
March 16, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 3/16/2022. (jsi)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (scn)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DISABILITY BENEFITS against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15470672, filed by Michele Solowsky. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Dabdoub, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solowsky v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Solowsky
Represented By: Edward Philip Dabdoub
Represented By: Kevin E Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Cleveland Acree, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?