Barber v. The City of Miami et al
Plaintiff: Willie James Barber
Defendant: Alexander Garcia Contrearas, CITY OF MIAMI, The City of Miami and Officer Alexander Garcia Contrearas
Case Number: 1:2022cv20883
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER striking #9 the City of Miami's Motion to Dismiss. After the last Defendant is served, the Defendants shall file one joint motion (or separate answers) in accordance with [ECF No. 10] the Court's Order in Cases with Multiple Defendants. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/12/2022. (mg01)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 STRICKEN per DE# 11 , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The City of Miami. Responses due by 5/25/2022 (Fernandez, Brandon) Modified text on 5/12/2022 (jas).
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brandon Luis Fernandez on behalf of The City of Miami. Attorney Brandon Luis Fernandez added to party The City of Miami(pty:dft). (Fernandez, Brandon)
March 29, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Alexander Garcia Contrearas, The City of Miami. (jas)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Alexander Garcia-Contrearas by Willie James Barber (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Contrearas.Individually) (Jacobs, Jeffrey)
March 28, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) City of Miami by Willie James Barber (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Contrearas.Liaison, #2 Summon(s) Contrearas.Ind) (Jacobs, Jeffrey)
March 25, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Willie James Barber Civil Cover Sheet (Jacobs, Jeffrey)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jas)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15501723, filed by Willie James Barber.(Jacobs, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barber v. The City of Miami et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie James Barber
Represented By: Jeffrey Alan Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Garcia Contrearas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF MIAMI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Miami
Represented By: Brandon Luis Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Alexander Garcia Contrearas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?