GONZALEZ v. Holiday CVS, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: DULVI GONZALEZ
Defendant: HOLIDAY CVS, L.L.C. D/B/A NAVARRO DISCOUNT PHARMACY #10700 and Holiday CVS, L.L.C. a foreign corporation doing business as Navarro Discount Pharmacy #10700
Case Number: 1:2022cv20898
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Orestes Rusty Perez as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 2:00 p.m.. (Perez, Orestes)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mr. Orestes Rusty Perez, Esq. Mediation Hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 2:00 PM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 29, 2022 Filing 17 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Orestes Rusty Perez as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 10/14/2022 at 2:00 p.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Mediation)(Liro, Jacob)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STRIKING #14 Initial Disclosures filed by DULVI GONZALEZ. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 14 (STRICKEN by DE#15 .) NOTICE of Compliance Rule 26(A(1) by DULVI GONZALEZ (Scher, Adam) Modified to reflect "stricken" on 4/15/2022 (wc).
April 8, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Compliance by DULVI GONZALEZ re #11 Order to Show Cause, (Scher, Adam)
April 8, 2022 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by DULVI GONZALEZ (Scher, Adam)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Plaintiff shall comply with the March 29, 2022 Order #4 by April 11, 2022, failing which the case will be dismissed without prejudice without further notice. Furthermore, in her written submission, Plaintiff shall explain why she failed to comply with the March 29, 2022 Order, necessitating this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Edwin G. Torres. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2023 in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 2/7/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 5/20/2022. Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 10/17/2022. Mediation Deadline 10/24/2022. All pre-trial and Daubert Motions due by 11/1/2022. Joint Pretrial Stipulation and In Limine Motions due by 11/29/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 7, 2022 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A - Schedule Jointly Proposed by the Parties, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation)(Liro, Jacob)
April 7, 2022 Filing 8 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for Holiday CVS, L.L.C. (Liro, Jacob)
April 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. re #3 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines re: Filing of the Docket Sheet, Index of the docket entries and docket entries from the underlying State Court action (Attachments: #1 Supplement Index of State Court Docket Entries, #2 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Notice of Serving Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's Request for Production, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's Request for Admissions, #7 Exhibit 6 - Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time, #8 Exhibit 7 - Summons received by Clerk re: Holiday CVS, LLC, #9 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve, #10 Exhibit 9 - Summons stamped by Clerk re: Holiday CVS, LLC, #11 Exhibit 10 - Return of Service of Summons, Complaint and Discovery, #12 Exhibit 11 - Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, #13 Exhibit 12 - Case Management Order, #14 Exhibit 13 - Defendant's Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #15 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet) (Liro, Jacob)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT of Removal by Holiday CVS, L.L.C. (Liro, Jacob)
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Holiday CVS, L.L.C.. (Liro, Jacob)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 4/7/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/29/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15505251, filed by HOLIDAY CVS, L.L.C. D/B/A NAVARRO DISCOUNT PHARMACY #10700. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Composite Exhibit, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiff's Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Holiday CVS 2021 Annual Report, #5 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court))(Liro, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GONZALEZ v. Holiday CVS, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DULVI GONZALEZ
Represented By: Adam Geoffrey Scher
Represented By: Ryan Scher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOLIDAY CVS, L.L.C. D/B/A NAVARRO DISCOUNT PHARMACY #10700
Represented By: Jacob J Liro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holiday CVS, L.L.C. a foreign corporation doing business as Navarro Discount Pharmacy #10700
Represented By: Michael Leonard McCoy
Represented By: Jacob J Liro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?