Young v. Albertson et al
Plaintiff: Sharnay Young
Defendant: Samantha J. Albertson, Manuel D. Guerrero Avila and Lyft Florida, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv20971
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #7 Transmittal Letter Sent (ail)
April 4, 2022 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter Sent with Transmittal Letter and Order of Remand to: Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. State Court Case Number: 22-003666-CA-01 (amb)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in and for Miami-Dade County, Florida. The parties shall bear their own attorneys fees, interest, and costs. Any pending motions are denied as moot, and the Clerk is directed to mark this case closed.. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (amb)
April 4, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), to Remand by Lyft Florida, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sarason, Scott)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 4/11/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 4/11/2022. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
March 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15520664, filed by Lyft Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Sarason, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Albertson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharnay Young
Represented By: Jodi Chase Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha J. Albertson
Represented By: George Louis Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manuel D. Guerrero Avila
Represented By: George Louis Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyft Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Ligianette Cordova
Represented By: Michael Roland Holt
Represented By: Scott M. Sarason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?