Castro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Celia Marie Castro
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv21057
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Melissa Damian
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 6/1/2022, response/answer due 8/1/2022. (mee)
April 20, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lbc)
April 19, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Celia Marie Castro (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Jones, Justin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Granting to the extent that Plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. U.S. Marshals Service ordered. Summonses provided for issuance by Clerk for U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 4/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (oco)
April 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Celia Marie Castro. (Jones, Justin)
April 7, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The filing fee has not been paid (jc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (jc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Celia Marie Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Jones, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Marie Castro
Represented By: Justin David Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?