Nunez v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Plaintiff: Jose Enrique Nunez Ventura
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Hialeah Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv21117
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Dismiss. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss #9 . Upon a review of the Motion and the record, the Motion is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED and CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/2/2022. (shy)
June 2, 2022 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus,, by Attorney General of the United States, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Hialeah Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security. Attorney David E. Werner added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Werner added to party Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Werner added to party District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Werner added to party Hialeah Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Werner added to party Secretary, Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). Responses due by 6/16/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Werner, David)
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Hialeah Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary, Department of Homeland Security, U.S Attorney. (lbc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Jose Enrique Nunez Ventura (Flanagan, Patricia)
April 12, 2022 Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (jas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States. (jas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating documents. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (jas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (jas)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15551632, filed by Jose Enrique Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Nunez_Civil cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Nunez_Summons, #3 Exhibit A. Plaintiffs Permanent Residence Card, #4 Exhibit B. N-400 Receipt notice, #5 Exhibit C. N-400 Interview notice, #6 Exhibit D. Interview Online status, #7 Exhibit E. Inquiry response receipt, #8 Exhibit F. N-400 Historic Processing times)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Flanagan, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Attorney General of the United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Enrique Nunez Ventura
Represented By: Patricia Castillo Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hialeah Field Office Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: David E. Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?