del Campo-Aguila et al v. American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joyce del Campo-Aguila, Orlando Aguila, A. S. and A. R.
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. doing business as Au Pair in America, Stephanie Stephenson Martins and Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera
Case Number: 1:2022cv21146
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 25 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Joyce del Campo-Aguila (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Dieppa, Raymond)
May 17, 2022 Filing 24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. (Unice, Thomas)
May 17, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Willie Benjamin Ramhofer on behalf of Orlando Aguila, A. R., A. S., Joyce del Campo-Aguila (Ramhofer, Willie)
May 17, 2022 Filing 22 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera. (Padron, Che)
May 13, 2022 Filing 21 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Joyce del Campo-Aguila identifying Other Affiliate The Hartford Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Geico Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Florida Legal, LLC, Other Affiliate Raymond Dieppa, Esq., Other Affiliate LEXINGTON INSURANCE COMPANY, Other Affiliate Will Ramhofer, Esq., Other Affiliate Ramhofer Garcia, LLC, Other Affiliate Thomas Robert Unice, Jr., Other Affiliate UNICE SALZMAN JENSEN, P.A., Other Affiliate Che Christian Padron, Other Affiliate Zediker, Associates, P.A., Other Affiliate ADP TotalSource CO XXI Inc., Other Affiliate Helmsman Management Services, Inc. for Joyce del Campo-Aguila (Dieppa, Raymond)
May 9, 2022 Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Stephanie Stephenson Martins. (Padron, Che) Modified Selected Filer on 5/10/2022 (pcs).
May 9, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE by Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera, Stephanie Stephenson Martins Email Designations (Padron, Che)
May 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Che Christian Padron on behalf of Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera, Stephanie Stephenson Martins. Attorney Che Christian Padron added to party Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera(pty:dft), Attorney Che Christian Padron added to party Stephanie Stephenson Martins(pty:dft). (Padron, Che)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 5/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 6, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.. Attorney Thomas Robert Unice, Jr added to party American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.(pty:dft). (Unice, Thomas)
April 28, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Joyce del Campo-Aguila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dieppa, Raymond)
April 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Striking #11 Summons Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service filed by Joyce del Campo-Aguila, #12 Summons Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service filed by Joyce del Campo-Aguila by Joyce del Campo-Aguila (Dieppa, Raymond) Modified Link on 4/29/2022 (ls).
April 28, 2022 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Summons Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document (Unsigned). The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (ls)
April 27, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Joyce del Campo-Aguila. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dieppa, Raymond)
April 27, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service by Joyce del Campo-Aguila. Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera served on 4/27/2020, response/answer due 5/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dieppa, Raymond)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joyce del Campo-Aguila. American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. served on 4/19/2022, response/answer due 5/10/2022. (Dieppa, Raymond)
April 21, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Joyce del Campo-Aguila. Stephanie Stephenson Martins served on 4/19/2022, response/answer due 5/10/2022. (Dieppa, Raymond)
April 15, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera, (ls)
April 15, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Stephanie Stephenson Martins. (ls)
April 15, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc.. (ls)
April 14, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (scrivener's error) against All Plaintiffs, filed by Joyce del Campo-Aguila.(Dieppa, Raymond)
April 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. d/b/a Au Pair in America; Rayane Aparecida Santos; de Olivera; Stephanie Stephenson Martins by Joyce del Campo-Aguila re #1 Complaint filed by A. R., Joyce del Campo-Aguila, A. S., Orlando Aguila (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Dieppa, Raymond)
April 14, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jua)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15559986, filed by Joyce del Campo-Aguila, A. R., A. S., Orlando Aguila. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dieppa, Raymond)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: del Campo-Aguila et al v. American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce del Campo-Aguila
Represented By: Willie Benjamin Ramhofer
Represented By: Raymond Renato Dieppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Aguila
Represented By: Willie Benjamin Ramhofer
Represented By: Raymond Renato Dieppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. S.
Represented By: Willie Benjamin Ramhofer
Represented By: Raymond Renato Dieppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. R.
Represented By: Willie Benjamin Ramhofer
Represented By: Raymond Renato Dieppa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Institute for Foreign Study, Inc. doing business as Au Pair in America
Represented By: Thomas Robert Unice, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Stephenson Martins
Represented By: Che Christian Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rayane Aparecida Santos De Olivera
Represented By: Che Christian Padron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?