Morgan v. Ferguson, Jr
Plaintiff: William R Morgan
Defendant: Thomas C Ferguson, Jr
Case Number: 1:2022cv21152
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance TRANSFERRED to the Key West Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida re #6 Order on Motion to Change Venue. (ebz)
May 4, 2022 Civil Case Terminated. Case administratively closed Transfer to a Key West Division. All subsequent filing shall bear 22CV10035 Judge King. Closing Case. (ebz)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO KEY WEST DIVISION re #3 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 5/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Tyler Jon Tanner (Tanner, Tyler)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue to Key West Division filed by Thomas C Ferguson, Jr. Replies due by 5/10/2022. (McAlpin, Richard)
April 19, 2022 Filing 3 Plaintiff's MOTION to Change Venue to Key West Division by William R Morgan. Responses due by 5/3/2022 (DiCowden, Mark)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15561432, filed by Thomas C Ferguson, Jr. No Motion to Dismiss has been attached. Answers have been attached. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Return of Service, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Answer and Affirmative Defenses, #6 Exhibit Reply to Affirmative Defenses, #7 Exhibit Scheduling Order, #8 Exhibit Notice of Serving Prelim Scheduling Order, #9 Exhibit Federal Court Civil Cover Sheet)(McAlpin, Richard) (ebz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan v. Ferguson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R Morgan
Represented By: Mark Gabriel DiCowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas C Ferguson, Jr
Represented By: Richard James McAlpin
Represented By: Tyler Jon Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?