McDaniel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Caren Joy McDaniel
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv21201
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Melissa Damian
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2022 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE of Compliance re #8 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. (Package Prepared for Marshals Office). (drz)
May 26, 2022 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (drz)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Plaintiff's Motion For Service of Summons(es) and Complaint by U.S. Marshals Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 5/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (oco)
May 19, 2022 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION Motion for Service of Summons and Complaint by Marshal re #1 Complaint,, by Caren Joy McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Read, Tod)
May 16, 2022 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 5/16/2022 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS250639. (vt)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 4/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (oco)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending (ail)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Caren Joy McDaniel. (ail)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King and Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Reversal of the Commissioners Final Decision against Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Caren Joy McDaniel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #3 Assignment of EAJA Fees, #4 Summon(s) Juan Gonzalez, Acting US Attorney (SDFL), #5 Summon(s) Merrick Garland US Attorney General, #6 Summon(s) Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Read, Tod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDaniel v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caren Joy McDaniel
Represented By: Tod William Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi, Acting Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?