Ramirez v. Carnival Corporation
Plaintiff: Yolanda Ramirez
Defendant: Carnival Corporation and Carnival Corporation a Panamanian Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Lines
Case Number: 1:2022cv21202
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Yolanda Ramirez. Carnival Corporation served on 6/3/2022, response/answer due 6/24/2022. (Gerson, Philip)
May 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
April 19, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (mab)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party names in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (mab)
April 18, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15568646, filed by Yolanda Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons)(Gerson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Ramirez
Represented By: Nicholas I. Gerson
Represented By: Brian M Andino
Represented By: David L Markel
Represented By: Edward Steven Schwartz
Represented By: Philip Maurice Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation a Panamanian Corporation doing business as Carnival Cruise Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?