Gautier v. Monta et al
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA GAUTIER
Defendant: Martin D. Monta, Royal Truck Leasing LLC and HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC.
Case Number: 1:2022cv21400
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Melissa Damian
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to #5 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Supplemental Filing by Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Royal Truck Leasing LLC (Attachments: #1 Supplement Plaintiff's medical bills)(Nicklaus, Edward)
June 2, 2022 Filing 7 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cassandra Gautier. (Balkan, Adam)
May 27, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE by Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Royal Truck Leasing LLC (Nicklaus, Edward) Modified Text on 5/31/2022 (ls).
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court with incorporated memorandum of law filed by Hansen & Adkins Auto Transport, Inc., Royal Truck Leasing LLC. Replies due by 6/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Florida Traffic Crash Report, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Nicklaus, Edward)
May 23, 2022 Filing 4 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cassandra Gautier. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Balkan, Adam)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for all pretrial, non-dispositive and discovery matters. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 5/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) Modified text on 5/6/2022 (pc).
May 4, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
May 4, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15614332, filed by HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC., Royal Truck Leasing LLC, Martin D. Monta. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet USDC Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit California Div of Corps & SAFER, #4 Exhibit State Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Pltfs Demand Letter, #6 Exhibit Composite of State Court Filings, #7 Exhibit Answer and Aff Dfs, #8 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court)(Nicklaus, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gautier v. Monta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA GAUTIER
Represented By: Adam Mark Balkan
Represented By: Jared Francis Bossola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin D. Monta
Represented By: Edward Randall Nicklaus
Represented By: Michael Faustino Amezaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Truck Leasing LLC
Represented By: Edward Randall Nicklaus
Represented By: Michael Faustino Amezaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANSEN & ADKINS AUTO TRANSPORT, INC.
Represented By: Edward Randall Nicklaus
Represented By: Michael Faustino Amezaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?