Zapata v. Florida Division of Elections et al
Plaintiff: Randy Zapata
Defendant: Florida Division of Elections, Ron DeSantiss, Charlie Crist and Nikki Fried
Case Number: 1:2022cv22424
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Civil Rights Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Zapata. (jas)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Dismissal for Failure to Pay Fees or to File an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Without Prejudice) . Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 8/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Require and Appeal that Will Include Federal Criminal Charges Upon the Honorable Robert N. Scola, Jr. by Randy Zapata. (jas)
August 8, 2022 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance re 5 Paperless Order. (Order mailed to Randy Zapata at 6905 N W 173rd Drive, St. O205, Hialeah, FL 33015). (jas)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER: Plaintiff Randy Zapata, proceeding pro se, has filed a complaint, initiating this case, without including either the appropriate filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis, contrary to the Court's Civil Filing Requirements Rule 4C. Upon the filing of his case, the Clerk immediately notified Zapata of the deficiency, advising him to pay the filing fee within twenty-four hours. Zapata has not complied and the time to do so has passed. The Court therefore advises him that, in order for his case to proceed, he must either submit the required fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before August 19, 2022. Should the Plaintiff fail to do either, the Court will dismiss his complaint without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to the Plaintiff at the address indicated on the docket. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
August 2, 2022 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (scn)
August 2, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Filing fees not paid. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Compliance of Filing Fee, and electronically pay the correct fees of $402.00 within 24 hours of this notice. (scn)
August 2, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Randy Zapata. Responses due by 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(scn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zapata v. Florida Division of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Zapata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Division of Elections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron DeSantiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Crist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikki Fried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?