HAGLE v. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: AUTUMN HAGLE
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. a Liberian corporation, Broward County, Intercruises Shoreside & Port Services, Inc. and Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd
Case Number: 1:2022cv23186
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lisette M Reid
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333 Admiralty
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AUTUMN HAGLE. Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd waiver sent on 10/28/2022, response/answer due 12/27/2022. (Goodman, Lisa)
November 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elisha Sullivan and Jerry D Hamilton on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. Attorneys Elisha Sullivan and Jerry D Hamilton added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd(pty:dft). (Sullivan, Elisha) Text Modified on 11/14/2022 (scn).
November 10, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charlotte Paige Zubizarreta on behalf of Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. Attorney Charlotte Paige Zubizarreta added to party Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd(pty:dft). (Zubizarreta, Charlotte)
November 1, 2022 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #8 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document. (scn)
November 1, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AUTUMN HAGLE. Intercruises Shoreside & Port Services, Inc. served on 10/28/2022, response/answer due 11/18/2022. (Goodman, Lisa) Date Modified on 11/2/2022 (scn).
November 1, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AUTUMN HAGLE. Broward County waiver sent on 10/28/2022, response/answer due 12/27/2022. (Goodman, Lisa)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE LISETTE M. REID. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE AND PROCEDURES: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/14/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Heyward Hickey on behalf of AUTUMN HAGLE (Hickey, John)
October 3, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Broward County, Intercruises Shoreside & Port Services, Inc., Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. (scn)
September 30, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
September 30, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15989242, filed by AUTUMN HAGLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Goodman, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAGLE v. ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUTUMN HAGLE
Represented By: Lisa Charli Goodman
Represented By: John Heyward Hickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES, LTD. a Liberian corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broward County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intercruises Shoreside & Port Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd
Represented By: Elisha Sullivan
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Represented By: Charlotte Paige Zubizarreta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?