Cooseman's Miami, Inc. v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: COOSEMAN'S MIAMI, INC. and Coosemans Miami, Inc.
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv23264
Filed: October 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Peter Abraham. Mediation Hearing set for 5/24/2022 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
December 2, 2022 Filing 22 Defendant's NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Peter Abraham as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 5/24/2022 at 9:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jurman, Rory)
November 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Notice of Mediation and Proposed Order by December 2, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 23, 2022 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Notice of Mediation and Proposed Order by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jurman, Rory)
November 22, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss #14 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal COUNT II OF PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/6/2022 (Jurman, Rory)
November 18, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE by Coosemans Miami, Inc. Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Van Name, Timothy)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Strike and Deny as Moot. See ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss. See Amended Complaint at ECF No. #14 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 14, 2022 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), As Moot by Coosemans Miami, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2022 (Van Name, Timothy)
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coosemans Miami, Inc., filed by Coosemans Miami, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Insurance Policy)(Van Name, Timothy)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 1/3/2023., Discovery due by 6/27/2023., Expert Discovery due by 6/27/2023., Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2023., In Limine Motions due by 7/19/2023., Dispositive Motions due by 7/19/2023., Pretrial Motions due by 7/19/2023., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/9/2023., Jury Trial set for 10/23/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 10/17/2023 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 7/11/2023.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for all Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
November 4, 2022 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jurman, Rory)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 STRICKEN per DE# 17 , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/14/2022 (Jurman, Rory) Modified text on 11/15/2022 (jas).
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Aspen U.S. Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate DANIEL RODRIGUEZ, ESQ., Other Affiliate Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP, Other Affiliate Aspen American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Apollo Global Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Jenelle E. La Chuisa, Esq., Other Affiliate Aspen (UK) Holdings, Limited, Other Affiliate Highlands Bermuda Holdco, Ltd., Other Affiliate Cooseman's Miami, Inc., Other Affiliate Ramon Rodriguez & Blanco-Herrera, LLP, Other Affiliate Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, a Bermuda Company, Other Affiliate Gurian Group, Other Affiliate Rory Eric Jurman, Esq., Other Affiliate Harrison D. St. Germain, Esq. for Aspen Specialty Insurance Company (Jurman, Rory)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Scheduling Report by November 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
October 28, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Joint Scheduling Report and Proposed Order by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/14/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jurman, Rory)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #6 , Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended to October 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (aun)
October 14, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 10/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jurman, Rory)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. (Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 10/28/2022), Aspen Specialty Insurance Company response/answer due 10/14/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 7, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Jurman, Rory)
October 7, 2022 Filing 3 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (rbe)
October 7, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
October 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16007581, filed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Pleadings (Complaint), #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C- DECLARATION OF DANIEL DILLON IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REMOVAL, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Jurman, Rory) Modified text & attachment description on 10/7/2022 (rbe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooseman's Miami, Inc. v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COOSEMAN'S MIAMI, INC.
Represented By: Daniel Jose Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coosemans Miami, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jose Rodriguez
Represented By: Timothy J Van Name
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jenelle E. La Chuisa
Represented By: Rory Eric Jurman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?