Villoldo et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Alfredo Villoldo, Gustavo E. Villoldo, individually and as Administrator, Executor, and Personal Representative of the Estate of Gustavo Villoldo Argilagos and Gustavo E. Villoldo
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Fidel Castro Ruz, Raul Castro Ruz, THE MINISTRY OF INTERIOR, THE ARMY OF THE REPUBLIC OF CUBA and THE REPUBLIC OF CUBA
Case Number: 1:2022cv23502
Filed: October 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supporting Bank of America, N.A.'s Reply In Support of Motion to Transfer)(Schaeffer, Reid) Modified text on 12/22/2022 (ebz).
December 21, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of Striking #26 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Bank of America, N.A. by Bank of America, N.A. (Schaeffer, Reid)
December 21, 2022 Filing 26 STRICKEN. REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re #19 EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration supporting Reply in Support to Motion to Transfer)(Schaeffer, Reid) Modified text on 12/22/2022 (ebz). Modified per DE #27 Notice of Striking on 12/22/2022 (ebz).
December 14, 2022 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Alfredo Villoldo, Gustavo E. Villoldo. Replies due by 12/21/2022. (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
December 8, 2022 Filing 24 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Alfredo Villoldo, Gustavo E. Villoldo. (Kavanaugh, Samantha) Modified text on 12/9/2022 (ebz).
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER: Having considered the parties' briefing on the Plaintiffs' #19 motion for an extension of their deadline to respond to Defendant Bank of America's #16 motion to transfer venue, the Court partially grants the motion as follows: The Plaintiffs will respond to the #16 motion to transfer venue no later than December 14, 2022. The Court will not consider further motions for extensions of that deadline unless jointly moved for by the parties or unopposed by Defendant Bank of America. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (eau)
December 2, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #16 MOTION to Change Venue . Per DE 23 Order. Responses due by 12/14/2022 (ebz)
December 1, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Bank of America, N.A.. Replies due by 12/8/2022. (Schaeffer, Reid)
December 1, 2022 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #19 EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #16 MOTION to Change Venue by Bank of America, N.A.. (Schaeffer, Reid)
November 29, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #19 EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #16 MOTION to Change Venue . Per DE 20 Order. Responses due by 12/1/2022 (ebz)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court instructs the Defendant to respond to the Plaintiffs' motion #19 no later than December 1, 2022. In light of the Plaintiffs' request for a ruling by December 2, 2022, no reply will be allowed. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (eau)
November 28, 2022 Filing 19 EXPEDITED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #16 MOTION to Change Venue by Alfredo Villoldo, Gustavo E. Villoldo. (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
November 23, 2022 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer signed by: Angela Dashnaw re #16 MOTION to Change Venue by Bank of America, N.A. (Schaeffer, Reid)
November 23, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT Declaration in Support of Motion to Transfer signed by: Craig T. Cagney re #16 MOTION to Change Venue by Bank of America, N.A. (Schaeffer, Reid)
November 23, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Change Venue by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 12/7/2022 (Schaeffer, Reid)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER: By agreement of the parties, the Court grants the #14 motion for a stay of these proceedings as to all matters except for issues concerning venue. Although the latter is not stayed by this Order, the Court remarks that the interests of judicial economy favor it considering the matters raised in the motion for remand before considering any motion on venue because the motion for remand raises issues going directly to the subject-matter jurisdiction of federal courts. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (eau)
November 17, 2022 Filing 14 EXPEDITED MOTION To Stay Proceedings Pending Disposition of Petitioners' Motion to Remand by Alfredo Villoldo, Gustavo E. Villoldo. (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alfredo Villoldo, Gustavo E. Villoldo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Action September 27, 2022 Order)(Kavanaugh, Samantha)
November 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit Supporting by Bank of America, N.A. re #10 Response/Reply (Other) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Schaeffer, Reid) Modified Text on 11/2/2022 (ls).
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
October 28, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Notice to Appear by Bank of America, N.A.. (Schaeffer, Reid)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice #3 #5 are GRANTED. Attorneys Michael S. Flynn and Craig T. Cagney may appear and participate in this action on behalf of Bank of America, N.A. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings at the e-mail addresses indicated in their respective motions. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (eau)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Kathleen M. Williams recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (bms)
October 27, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bank of America, N.A. (Schaeffer, Reid)
October 27, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Craig T. Cagney. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16057518 by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 11/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Reid)
October 27, 2022 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Craig T. Cagney and Charles B. Rosenberg, mailing date October 27, 2022, (pt)
October 27, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael S. Flynn. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-16057195 by Bank of America, N.A.. Responses due by 11/10/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schaeffer, Reid)
October 26, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe)
October 26, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16055898, filed by Bank of America, N.A. No Answer/ Motion to Dismiss Filed (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- CORRECTED SECOND AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT, #3 Exhibit B- State Court Documents, #4 Exhibit C)(Schaeffer, Reid) Modified text & attachment description on 10/27/2022 (rbe). Modified on 10/27/2022 (rbe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villoldo et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Villoldo
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Represented By: Charles B. Rosenberg
Represented By: Ross Elliot Linzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo E. Villoldo, individually and as Administrator, Executor, and Personal Representative of the Estate of Gustavo Villoldo Argilagos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo E. Villoldo
Represented By: Ross Elliot Linzer
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Represented By: Charles B. Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Reid Alan Schaeffer
Represented By: Craig T. Cagney
Represented By: Baris John Okcular
Represented By: Michael S. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Castro Ruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Castro Ruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE MINISTRY OF INTERIOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ARMY OF THE REPUBLIC OF CUBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE REPUBLIC OF CUBA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?