Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Takera Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2022cv23667
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/21/2022, response/answer due 1/20/2023. (mee)
November 30, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S.Marshal as to Attorney General served on 11/30/2022, response/answer due 1/30/2023. (mee)
November 15, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by U.S. Marshals as to United States Attorney served on 11/14/2022, response/answer due 1/13/2023. (mee)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jas)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
November 7, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Takera Jackson. (jas)
November 7, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Takera Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Takera Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?