MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv24133
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES: Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Case No. 22-cv-24133 is CONSOLIDATED with the cases already consolidated under Case No. 22-cv-24131 as follows: The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE Case No. 22-cv-24133 for administrative purposes only.All future filings in the cases shall be made under Case No. 22-cv-24131 only. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
February 14, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. Per Order, DE#7 . (nan)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jose E. Martinez recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 2/13/2023. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
February 13, 2023 Filing 5 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSP Recovery Holding Series 01, LLC. Other Affiliate Hazel Holdings I LLC, Other Affiliate Hazel Partners Holdings, LLC for MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (McGovern, Amanda) Modified Text on 2/14/2023 (ls).
February 13, 2023 Filing 4 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(McGovern, Amanda)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Pennekamp, John)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16188990, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint & Other Records) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss. (Pennekamp, John) Modified on 12/21/2022 (aao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Marie McGovern
Represented By: Erimar Von der Osten
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Macejka
Represented By: Robert Ralph Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?