MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv24137
Filed: December 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2023 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rivero, Andres)
February 16, 2023 Filing 22 Plaintiff's REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 Corrected MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Jennifer C. Jordan and Expert Report filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. (Rivero, Andres)
February 9, 2023 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Jennifer C. Jordan and Expert Report, #20 Corrected MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Jennifer C. Jordan and Expert Report filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Replies due by 2/16/2023. (Pennekamp, John)
February 8, 2023 Filing 20 Corrected MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Jennifer C. Jordan and Expert Report by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Responses due by 2/22/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
February 7, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike Defendant's Expert Jennifer C. Jordan and Expert Report by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Responses due by 2/21/2023 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rivero, Andres)
February 3, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for March 28, 2023, 12:30 p.m.. (Arrizabalaga, Markel)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/31/2023. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Markel Arrizabalaga, Esq. Mediation Hearing set via zoom for 3/28/2023 at 12:30 PM. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/31/2023. (mmd)
January 31, 2023 Filing 15 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Markel Arrizabalaga as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/28/2023 at 12:30 pm. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order)(Malave, Ana)
January 30, 2023 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #13 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing,. Parties/Mediator Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (ebz)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC, Arrizaba as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 03/28/2023 at 12:30 pm. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Order)(Malave, Ana)
January 26, 2023 Filing 12 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PROTECTIVE ORDER by MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order)(McGovern, Amanda)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline. Discovery Deadline is extended to 3/6/2023. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/18/2022. (mmd)
January 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Pennekamp, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andres Rivero on behalf of MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC. Attorney Andres Rivero added to party MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC(pty:pla). (Rivero, Andres)
January 6, 2023 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Pennekamp, John)
January 6, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #3 Order NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET AND PLEADINGS (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court, #2 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit State Court Uniform Case Management Order, #5 Exhibit State Court Proposed Summons, #6 Exhibit State Court Summons Issued, #7 Exhibit State Court Notice of Service of Process, #8 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Pennekamp, John)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 4/5/2023. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (er02)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 5/30/2023 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (er02) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 27, 2022 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Pennekamp, John)
December 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN REMOVAL CASES. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/27/2022. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
December 21, 2022 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab)
December 21, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16189528, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. No Answer Filed/No Motion To Dismiss Filed In State Court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record)(Pennekamp, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/21/2022: #3 State Court Complaint) (mab). Modified Text on 12/21/2022 (mab).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series 44, LLC
Represented By: Amanda Marie McGovern
Represented By: Ana C Malave
Represented By: Jordan Matthew Macejka
Represented By: Robert Ralph Jimenez
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Pennekamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?